New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Defendant: Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN
Case Number: 0:2020cv01358
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC re #11 Clerk's Entry of Default (Wendt, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN (kt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC re #9 Application for Entry of Default (Wendt, Kathryn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT THEREOF. (Wendt, Kathryn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Vehrs, Karla)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Tammy Manderscheid - Executive Director of Housing & Development Authority of Pipestone, MN on 6/16/2020, filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Vehrs, Karla) Modified text on 6/23/2020 (lmb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Deb Nelson - City Clerk, Pipestone, MN on 6/16/2020, filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Vehrs, Karla) Modified text on 6/23/2020 (lmb).
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN. (kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1358 DWF/DTS. (kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC is indirectly owned by AT&T Inc. (Vehrs, Karla) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (kt).
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7795963) filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vehrs, Karla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn E. Wendt
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Pipestone, MN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?