George et al v. Jerke & Sons Construction Co. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Carlson, Timothy Gillen, Jason George, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the, Michael Crabtree and Marvin Hose
Defendant: Keith J. Jerke and Jerke & Sons Construction Co.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01359
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keith J. Jerke, Jerke & Sons Construction Co. (MMP)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce Carlson, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Michael Crabtree, Jason George, Timothy Gillen, Marvin Hose, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the re #6 Declaration, #5 Application for Entry of Default (Court, Amy)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Amy L. Court re #5 Application for Entry of Default by Bruce Carlson, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Michael Crabtree, Jason George, Timothy Gillen, Marvin Hose, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the . (Court, Amy)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Court, Amy)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the, Michael Crabtree, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Timothy Gillen, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Jason George, Marvin Hose, Bruce Carlson. Keith J. Jerke served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020; Jerke & Sons Construction Co. served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Court, Amy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Keith J. Jerke, Jerke & Sons Construction Co. (MKB)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1359 (PJS/KMM). (MKB)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith J. Jerke, Jerke & Sons Construction Co. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7797141) filed by The Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, Michael Crabtree, The Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, Timothy Gillen, The Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, Jason George, Marvin Hose, Bruce Carlson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Jerke & Sons Construction Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gillen
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason George
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crabtree
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Hose
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith J. Jerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerke & Sons Construction Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?