Yang v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Felicia Yang
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01397
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
3 Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Felicia Yang re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Felicia Yang. (MKB)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/23/2020. (KAT)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that case 20-cv-1397 (DWF/DTS) has been reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Donovan W. Frank, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1397 (SRN/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/18/2020.(MMP) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (MMP).
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1397 (DWF/DTS). (MMP)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Felicia Yang. (Schwiebert, Darren) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (MMP).
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Felicia Yang. (Schwiebert, Darren)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed by Felicia Yang. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schwiebert, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Yang
Represented By: Darren B. Schwiebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?