Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc. v. JBS USA Food Company Holdings et al
Plaintiff: Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Cargill, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. and National Beef Packing Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01414
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant JBS USA Food Company Holdings. (Heeman, Donald)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeremy Keeney for Tyson Foods, Inc.; granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jon B. Jacobs for Tyson Foods, Inc.; granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ulrike Connelly for Tyson Foods, Inc.; granting #37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Susan E Foster for Tyson Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020. (NAH)
July 27, 2020 Filing 38 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy C. Keeney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915106 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (NAH).
July 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan E. Foster. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915054 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (NAH).
July 27, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ulrike B. Connelly. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7914944 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (NAH).
July 27, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jon Jacobs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7914899 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (NAH).
July 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy C. Keeney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7914794 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (NAH).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky for Cargill, Inc.; granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark W Ryan for Cargill, Inc.; granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael E Lackey, Jr for Cargill, Inc.; granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen R Neuwirth for JBS USA Food Company Holdings; granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sami H Rashid for JBS USA Food Company Holdings. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/27/2020. (NAH)
July 24, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sami H. Rashid. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7911051 filed by JBS USA Food Company Holdings. (Heeman, Donald)
July 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen R. Neuwirth. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7911037 filed by JBS USA Food Company Holdings. (Heeman, Donald)
July 24, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Lackey, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7910765 filed by Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark W. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7910091 filed by Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7910065 filed by Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David P Graham on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Julie McEvoy for National Beef Packing Company; granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paula W Render for National Beef Packing Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/24/2020. (NAH)
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paula W. Render. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7906331 filed by National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie E. McEvoy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7906166 filed by National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Ellison on behalf of National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J Nelson on behalf of JBS USA Food Company Holdings. (Nelson, Jessica)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaints (15 in 0:20-cv-01414-JRT-HB), (20 in 0:20-cv-01319-JRT-HB). The deadlines for any Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints are extended to fortyfive (45) days after the Court rules on the pending Motions to Dismiss in the related case Peterson, et al. v. Agri Stats, Inc., et al. (ECF Nos. 117, 122, 124, 126 & 128 in Case No. 19-cv-1129 (JRT/HB)). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/17/2020.Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-01319-JRT-HB, 0:20-cv-01414-JRT-HB (JMK)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (extending time to respond) by Cargill, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Tyson Foods, Inc., and National Beef Packing Company. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Holley C. M. Horrell on behalf of Cargill, Inc.. (Horrell, Holley)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by X. Kevin Zhao on behalf of Cargill, Inc.. (Zhao, X.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn N. Hibbard on behalf of Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. JBS USA Food Company Holdings served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. Cargill, Inc. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. National Beef Packing Company served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 27, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1414 (JRT/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/25/2020.(KNK) Modified text on 6/26/2020 (KNK).
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (MKB).
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Don Barrett, Katherine Barrett Riley, David McMullan, Jonathan W. Cuneo, Blaine Finley as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cargill, Inc., JBS USA Food Company Holdings, National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. (KNK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1414 (NEB/TNL). (KNK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7814026) filed by Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Raiter, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc. v. JBS USA Food Company Holdings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company Holdings
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Randi J Winter
Represented By: Donald G Heeman
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W Ryan
Represented By: Nicole A. Saharsky
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Represented By: Michael E Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Holley C. M. Horrell
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hibbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Keeney
Represented By: Susan E Foster
Represented By: Ulrike Connelly
Represented By: Jon B. Jacobs
Represented By: David P Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company
Represented By: Julie McEvoy
Represented By: Paula W Render
Represented By: Benjamin L. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?