U.S. Bank National Association v. Truman 2016 SC6, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Truman 2016 SC6, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01423
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion to Unseal Complaint. Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 2, 2-1. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 8/10/2020 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/13/2020. (JMK)
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #8 Proposed Order to Judge filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Bimmerle, Raechel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #8 Proposed Order to Judge filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bimmerle, Raechel)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan M Robbin for Truman 2016 SC6, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/9/2020. (NAH)
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan M. Robbin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7866033 filed by Truman 2016 SC6, LLC. (Parker, Andrew)
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Parker on behalf of Truman 2016 SC6, LLC. (Parker, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by U.S. Bank National Association. U.S. Bank National Association waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Bimmerle, Raechel)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Riley for U.S. Bank National Association; granting #10 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jamie Smith George for U.S. Bank National Association. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/25/2020. (NAH)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Temporarily Seal Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/24/2020. (JMK)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jamie S. George. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7826469 filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Bimmerle, Raechel)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Riley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7826443 filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Bimmerle, Raechel)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 MOTION to SEAL #2 Complaint, filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Bimmerle, Raechel)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christopher A. Riley, Jamie S. George as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Truman 2016 SC6, LLC. (lmb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1423 (DSD/HB). (lmb)
June 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to SEAL #2 Complaint, filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bimmerle, Raechel)
June 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Truman 2016 SC6, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7817599) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bimmerle, Raechel) Modified restriction and text on 8/11/2020 (JME).
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. COMPLAINT against Truman 2016 SC6, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7816269) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bimmerle, Raechel) Modified text on 6/19/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Truman 2016 SC6, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Raechel J. Bimmerle
Represented By: Christopher A. Riley
Represented By: Jamie Smith George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman 2016 SC6, LLC
Represented By: Jesse H Kibort
Represented By: Jonathan M Robbin
Represented By: Christopher M Daniels
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?