Farnam Street Financial, Inc. v. The Riveter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Farnam Street Financial, Inc.
Defendant: The Riveter, Inc. and Riveter, Inc., The
Case Number: 0:2020cv01452
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Farnam Street Financial, Inc.. Jointly Signed by The Riveter, Inc..(Ashfield, Phillip)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/17/2020. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Farnam Street Financial, Inc.. (Ashfield, Phillip)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Riveter, Inc., The. (Schubert, Kirsten)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 The Riveter, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint filed by Riveter, Inc., The. (Schubert, Kirsten)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farnam Street Financial, Inc.. Riveter, Inc., The served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Ashfield, Phillip)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1452 ECT/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/25/2020.(KDS)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Riveter, Inc. (KDS)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1452 SRN/ECW. (KDS)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Riveter, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7828083) filed by Farnam Street Financial, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ashfield, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnam Street Financial, Inc. v. The Riveter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Riveter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riveter, Inc., The
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Donna Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farnam Street Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J Ashfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?