Solano v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah J. Solano
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01463
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (JMK)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Angela M Taylor for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/31/2020. (NAH)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Angela Taylor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7925893 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lacy, Samuel)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/27/2020. (JMK)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Hoglund, Lauren)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Policchio, James)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Louis Policchio, Jr for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/16/2020. (NAH)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James L. Policchio. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7882918 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lacy, Samuel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lacy, Samuel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Lewis Lacy on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lacy, Samuel)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah J. Solano. Trans Union LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah J. Solano. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah J. Solano. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC. (CLK)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1463 PJS/HB. (CLK)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7831253) filed by Sarah J Solano. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Angela M Taylor
Represented By: Samuel Lewis Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: James Louis Policchio, Jr.
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J. Solano
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?