Prader v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Prader
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01489
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
3 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 11/25/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 11/20/2020. Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/10/2020.Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-01489-JRT-BRT, 0:20-cv-01484-JRT-BRT(MSK) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (MMP).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 4/16/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 5/3/2021. Motions (disp) due by 9/30/2021. Ready for trial due by 1/31/2022. Telephone Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/10/2020.(MSK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/5/2020. (MSK)
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 U.S. Bank's ANSWER to Complaint filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Savran, Jessica)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Thomas Prader.(Chester, Anthony)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Thomas Prader (Chester, Anthony)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1489 (JRT/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/9/2020 and David S. Doty on 7/16/2020.(MMP)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. U.S. Bank National Association answer due 8/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/13/2020. (HAM)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION For Extension of Time by U.S. Bank National Association. Jointly Signed by Thomas Prader. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 3, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Regarding Related Cases. (Nicholson, Eric)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/1/2020.(HAM)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eric C. Tostrud recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1489 DSD/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/1/2020.(MMG)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric A. Nicholson for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/1/2020. (NAH)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Thomas Prader. (Myers, Gregory)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1489 ECT/TNL. (MMG)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Nicholson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7842794, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Myers, Gregory)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Nicholson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7842794 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian PLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7842715) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Consent Form US Bank National Association, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prader v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Prader
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Represented By: Erin L Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Represented By: Eric A. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?