Koebensky v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Adam Koebensky
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01540
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adam Koebensky (Chester, Anthony)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/8/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Harvey, Elena)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Adam Koebensky (Chester, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. PHH Mortgage Corporation shall have until and including August 6, 2020 to respond to Plaintiff Monica Neilsons Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/17/2020. (TMA)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 Declaration of Elena Harvey in Support of #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Harvey, Elena)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Harvey, Elena)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Callie Barr for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/13/2020. (NAH)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. response due 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/10/2020.(TMA)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Barr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7871175 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Adam Koebensky. (Myers, Gregory)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S CONSENT TO REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Harvey, Elena) Modified text on 7/10/2020 (lmb).
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1540 (WMW/ECW). (MKB)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Harvey, Elena)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wright County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7868009) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harvey, Elena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koebensky v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Elena D. Harvey
Represented By: Daniel Bitonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Callie Barr
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Koebensky
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?