Johnson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson
Defendant: Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01559
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union's #19 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union. (Olson, Ryan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union's ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. filed by Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union. (Olson, Ryan)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/18/2020.(TJB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Olson, Ryan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey Johnson. (Olson, Ryan)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eric C. Tostrud recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-01559 JRT/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/24/2020.(MTP)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union answer due 8/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/17/2020.(TJB)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/15/2020.(TJB) Modified text on 7/15/2020 (TJB).
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Olson, Ryan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Affinity Plus to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey Johnson. (Olson, Ryan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union. (Olson, Ryan)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Callie Barr for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/14/2020. (JGK)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey Johnson. (Myers, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1559 ECT/DTS. (MMG)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Barr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7874172 (Myers, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Barr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7874172 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7874151) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Consent Form Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Ryan A Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Represented By: Callie Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?