Porter v. Saul
Plaintiff: David Porter
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv01586
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Moss on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Moss, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (KDS)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/24/2020. (EB)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #4 Summons Issued. Summons is marked filed in error as the IFP has not been ruled on yet. (MMG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MMG) Modified text on 7/17/2020 (MMG).
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-1586 TNL. (MMG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by David Porter. (Fishman, Fay)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by David Porter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fishman, Fay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Porter
Represented By: Fay E Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?