Mozingo v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Mozingo
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 0:2020cv01587
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #5 Waiver of Service Executed: Service date and answer due date have been corrected on this entry. Unum Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (lmb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeffrey Mozingo. Unum Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (McCartin, Joseph) Modified service and answer due dates on 8/3/2020 (lmb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (CLK)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1587 PJS/TNL. (CLK)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7886847) filed by Jeffrey Mozingo. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCartin, Joseph)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America filed by Jeffrey Mozingo. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCartin, Joseph) Modified text on 7/16/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mozingo v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Mozingo
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Represented By: Joseph McCartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?