Orr et al v. Money Source, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Camille Orr and Anthony Orr
Defendant: Money Source, Inc., The
Case Number: 0:2020cv01589
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 10/13/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Money Source, Inc., The. (Schoeberl, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1589 JRT/DTS. (MMG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant The Money Source, Inc.. (Kelley, Timothy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMNDC-7887600) filed by The Money Source, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelley, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr et al v. Money Source, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Orr
Represented By: Paul H Weig
Represented By: Andrew C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Orr
Represented By: Paul H Weig
Represented By: Andrew C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Money Source, Inc., The
Represented By: James Schoeberl
Represented By: Timothy M Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?