Wheeler v. SageStream, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristin A. Wheeler
Defendant: SageStream, LLC and Innvois Data Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01590
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #19 Stipulation. SageStream, LLC answer due 9/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/10/2020.(MSK)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation. (Parker, Andrew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (SECOND) by SageStream, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kristin A. Wheeler. (Parker, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #16 Stipulation. SageStream, LLC answer due 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/8/2020.(MSK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Spak, Jason)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION with attached Certificate of Conferral and re #1 Complaint, #12 Order on Stipulation to extend Innovis's responsive pleading deadline to October 2, 2020 by Innvois Data Solutions, Inc. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff and Innovis Data Solutions, Inc. (Spak, Jason) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (MMP).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason A Spak for Innvois Data Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/13/2020. (NAH)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason A. Spak. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7961565 filed by Innvois Data Solutions, Inc.. (James, David)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Innvois Data Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/7/2020.(JGS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (James, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Innvois Data Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Kristin Wheeler. (James, David)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. SageStream, LLC answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/7/2020.(JGS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Kaplan, Abraham)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by SageStream, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kristin A. Wheeler. (Kaplan, Abraham)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham S Kaplan on behalf of SageStream, LLC. (Kaplan, Abraham)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristin A. Wheeler. Innvois Data Solutions, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristin A. Wheeler. SageStream, LLC served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Innvois Data Solutions, Inc., SageStream, LLC. (MKB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1590 (DSD/BRT). (MKB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Innvois Data Solutions, Inc, SageStream, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7889546) filed by Kristin A Wheeler. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. SageStream, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SageStream, LLC
Represented By: Abraham S Kaplan
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innvois Data Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A Spak
Represented By: David A James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin A. Wheeler
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?