Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant: J.B.S. S.A., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS USA Food Company Holdings, NATIONAL BEEF PACKING COMPANY, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01602
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 71 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. All papers shall be filed in the Lead Case File, IN RE DPP BEEF LITIGATION 20-cv-1319 JRT/HB, and no further papers shall be filed in this matter. (CLK)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting (61) Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class in case 0:20-cv-01319-JRT-HB; granting (56) Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class in case 0:20-cv-01602-JRT-HB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/4/2020. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-01319-JRT-HB, 0:20-cv-01602-JRT-HB (JMK)
September 2, 2020 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #68 Stipulation,. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
September 2, 2020 Filing 68 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation for Entry of Order on Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss) by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. Jointly Signed by National Beef Packing Company, LLC, Plaintiffs, JBS Packerland, Iinc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and JBS USA Food Company Holdings. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
September 2, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc. (Joint Agenda for Hearing and Case Management Conference on September 4th at 1:30) (Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (BY ZOOM): Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/20/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-01129-JRT-HB, 0:19-cv-01222-JRT-HB, 0:20-cv-01319-JRT-HB, 0:20-cv-01414-JRT-HB, 0:20-cv-01602-JRT-HB (JMK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 65 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Vince Ward as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 64 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 62 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc..(Gustafson, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 60 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #56 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc..(Gustafson, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 59 Declaration of Daniel E. Gustafson in Support of #56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H)(Gustafson, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class) : Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Gustafson, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Proposed Direct Purchaser Class) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Gustafson, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Tarringer for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joanne E. Matusko for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #54 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michele Burkholder for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/10/2020. (NAH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michele S. Burkholder. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7949711 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joanne E. Matusko. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7949707 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael S. Tarringer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7949703 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick Howard for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Julie McEvoy for National Beef Packing Company; granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paula W Render for National Beef Packing Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/4/2020. (NAH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Arthur Bailey, Sr for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marco Cercone for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Susan E Foster for Tyson Foods, Inc. and for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ulrike Connelly for Tyson Foods, Inc. and for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; granting #44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jon B. Jacobs for Tyson Foods, Inc. and for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; granting #45 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeremy Keeney for Tyson Foods, Inc. and for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/4/2020. (NAH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paula W. Render. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7940797 filed by National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie E.McEvoy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7940756 filed by National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Ellison on behalf of National Beef Packing Company. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy Keeney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7936660 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 8/4/2020 (NAH).
August 3, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jon Jacobs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7936656 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 8/4/2020 (NAH).
August 3, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ulrike Connelly. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7936626 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 8/4/2020 (NAH).
August 3, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan Foster. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7936610 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 8/4/2020 (NAH).
August 3, 2020 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. No parent corporation, publicly held corporation to report for Tyson Foods, Inc. (Graham, David) Modified text on 8/4/2020 (CLK).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael E Lackey, Jr for Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation and Cargill, Inc..; granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark W Ryan for Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation and Cargill, Inc..; granting #37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky for Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation and Cargill, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/3/2020. (JGK)
August 3, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marco Cercone. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7935736 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arthur N. Bailey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7935730 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 31, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7930822 filed by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark W. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7930813 filed by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Lackey, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7930798 filed by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dianne M. Nast for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel N. Gallucci for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney R Alexander Saveri for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cadio Zirpoli for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Warren T. Burns for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mallory T. Biblo for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William B. Thompson for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher J Cormier for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian D Penny for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/30/2020. (NAH)
July 30, 2020 Filing 33 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Joseph Goldberg, Vince Howard, Joseph N. Roda as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
July 29, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Howard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924254 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Penny. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924233 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher J. Cormier. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924223 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William B. Thompson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924216 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mallory T. Biblo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924211 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Warren T. Burns. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924205 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cadio Zirpoli. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924176 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Alexander Saveri. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924170 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel N. Gallucci. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924077 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dianne M. Nast. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924072 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mark Ryan, Michael E. Lackey, Jr., Nicole Saharsky, Julia E. McEvoy, Paula W. Render, Kevin Landau, Evan Rosin, R. Alexander Saveri, Cadio Zirpoli, Brian D. Penny, Jon B. Jacobs, Jeremy C. Keeney, Susan F. Foster, Ulrike B. Connelly, Patrick Howard, Charles J. Kocher, Stephen Neuwirth, Sami H. Rashid as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #19 Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadlines for any Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints are extended to forty-five (45) days after the Court rules on the pending Motions to Dismiss in the related case Peterson, et al. v. Agri Stats, Inc., et al. (ECF Nos. 117, 122, 124, 126 & 128 in Case No. 19-cv-1129 (JRT/HB)). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020.(JMK)
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation,. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (for extension of time to respond to complaint; waiver of service of summons) by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company Holdings, JBS Packerland, Inc., National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Holley C. M. Horrell on behalf of Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. (Horrell, Holley)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by X. Kevin Zhao on behalf of Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. (Zhao, X.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn N. Hibbard on behalf of Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc.. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Jeanne Morales on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Morales, Melinda)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1602 JRT/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/28/2020.(MMG)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth A Wexler for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Simon Bahne Paris for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/28/2020. (NAH)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Simon Bahne Paris. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7917937 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7914042 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melinda J. Morales. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7914024 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (NAH).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam J. Zapala for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth Tran Castillo for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dennis Stewart for Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/23/2020. (NAH)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dennis J. Stewart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7903046 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth Tran Castillo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7902408 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam J. Zapala. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7902383 filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Dennis J. Stewart, Adam J. Zapala, Alexander E. Barnett, James G.B. Dallal, Tamarah P. Prevost, Arthur N. Bailey, Marco Cercone, Esq., as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KDS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., J.B.S. S.A., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS USA Food Company Holdings, National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (KDS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1602 PJS/KMM. (KDS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., J.B.S. S.A., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS USA Food Company Holdings, NATIONAL BEEF PACKING COMPANY, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7892329) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustafson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B.S. S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Packerland, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Represented By: Randi J Winter
Represented By: Donald G Heeman
Represented By: Ethan C Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company Holdings
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Represented By: Randi J Winter
Represented By: Donald G Heeman
Represented By: Ethan C Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL BEEF PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: Julie McEvoy
Represented By: Paula W Render
Represented By: Benjamin L. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Represented By: Mark W Ryan
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hibbard
Represented By: Michael E Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Holley C. M. Horrell
Represented By: Nicole A. Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Represented By: Mark W Ryan
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hibbard
Represented By: Michael E Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Holley C. M. Horrell
Represented By: Nicole A. Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jon B. Jacobs
Represented By: Jeremy Keeney
Represented By: David P Graham
Represented By: Ulrike Connelly
Represented By: Susan E Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Jon B. Jacobs
Represented By: Jeremy Keeney
Represented By: David P Graham
Represented By: Ulrike Connelly
Represented By: Susan E Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Marco Cercone
Represented By: Michael Tarringer
Represented By: Christopher J Cormier
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Simon Bahne Paris
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Nathan D Prosser
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Mallory T. Biblo
Represented By: Cadio Zirpoli
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Joshua J Rissman
Represented By: Melinda Jeanne Morales
Represented By: William B. Thompson
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Arthur Bailey, Sr
Represented By: Kenneth A Wexler
Represented By: Joanne E. Matusko
Represented By: Michele Burkholder
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Represented By: Daniel N. Gallucci
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Michelle J Looby
Represented By: Dennis Stewart
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Represented By: Michael R Cashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?