Risk v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Lee Anne Judith Risk
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01616
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 6/30/2021. Motions (disp) due by 11/1/2021. Ready for trial due by 2/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/4/2020.(KAT)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 09:30 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/3/2020.(KAT)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/3/2020. See Minutes for details. (KAT)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Lee Anne Judith Risk.(Savran, Jessica)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Per request of counsel, the Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 10:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED. The Pretrial Conference will commence on 9/3/2020 at 11:30 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Counsel should use call-in instructions previously provided. (KAT)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Savran, Jessica) Modified text on 7/23/2020 (lmb).
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-01616 JRT/KMM. (MTP)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Savran, Jessica)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-cv-19-19565 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7901918) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Order Granting Leave to Plaintiff to Amend her Complaint to Add Punitive Damages Claim, #3 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 FILED IN ERROR. WILL REFILE: Wells Fargo's Answer to First Amended Complaint, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Savran, Jessica) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risk v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Anne Judith Risk
Represented By: Michael J Vanselow
Represented By: Marshall H Tanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?