Egide v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Egide Ndikumana and Ndikumana Egide
Respondent: Director of St. Paul Filed Office, Sheriff Kurt Freitag, William P. Barr, Secretary of Homeland Security and Peter Berg
Case Number: 0:2020cv01620
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ndikumana Egide (Bruning, John)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting (11) Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:20-cv-01620-WMW-HB. Petitioners name shall be corrected for the record and the docket shall be changed to reflect that his name is Ndikumana Egide. The cases of: (1) Egide v Barr, et al., Case No. 20-cv-1620 (WMW/HB) and (2) Egide v Barr, Case No. 20-cv-1673 (WMW/HB), shall be CONSOLIDATED into Egide v Barr, et al., 20-cv-1620 (WMW/HB) are consolidated for pre-trial proceedings and trial before District Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/7/2020. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-01620-WMW-HB, 0:20-cv-01673-WMW-HB(JMK)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 20-cv-1673 NEB/BRT has been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/6/2020.(CLK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-cv-1620-WMW-HB, 20-cv-1673-NEB-BRT filed by Egide Ndikumana.(Bruning, John)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-cv-1620-WMW-HB, 20-cv-1673-NEB-BRT filed by Egide Ndikumana. (Bruning, John)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying as moot #9 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Petitioner's previous Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. No. 2] was granted by the Court in an order dated July 28, 2020 [Doc. No. 6], and the Clerk's Office's letter dated August 3, 2020 [Doc. No. 8] was sent in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/5/2020. (ALM) Modified text on 8/5/2020 (MMP).
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Amended Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Egide Ndikumana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(MKB) Qc'd on 9/14/2020 (KNK).
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR - LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Ndikumana. (JGK) Modified text on 8/3/2020 (JGK).
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Bruning on behalf of Egide Ndikumana. (Bruning, John)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Respondents to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020. (JMK)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachment: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Director of St. Paul Filed Office, Secretary of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fuller, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Egide Ndikumana. (NAH)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Egide Ndikumana. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egide v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of St. Paul Filed Office
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Kurt Freitag
Represented By: David John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Egide Ndikumana
Represented By: John R. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ndikumana Egide
Represented By: John R. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?