Estes v. MRI Software LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trevon L. Estes
Defendant: Albin Acquisition Corporation doing business as Rental History Reports and MRI Software LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01624
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Albin Acquisition Corporation, MRI Software LLC. (Berhow, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Albin Acquisition Corporation answer due 9/16/2020; MRI Software LLC answer due 9/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/13/2020.(MSK)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Berhow, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Deadline to Respond by Albin Acquisition Corporation, MRI Software LLC. Jointly Signed by Trevon L. Estes. (Berhow, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edward Skipton for Trevon L. Estes. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/13/2020. (NAH)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (MSK).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James A Francis for Trevon L. Estes. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/11/2020. (NAH)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward H. Skipton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7951040 filed by Trevon L. Estes. (Strauss, Adam)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James A. Francis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7951014 filed by Trevon L. Estes. (Strauss, Adam)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T Berhow on behalf of All Defendants. (Berhow, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing James A. Francis, Edward Skipton as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Albin Acquisition Corporation d/b/a Rental History Reports, MRI Software LLC. (lmb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1624 (SRN/BRT). (lmb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albin Acquisition Corporation, MRI Software LLC (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7907940) filed by Trevon L. Estes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Strauss, Adam) Modified text on 7/24/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estes v. MRI Software LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albin Acquisition Corporation doing business as Rental History Reports
Represented By: Mark T Berhow
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRI Software LLC
Represented By: Mark T Berhow
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevon L. Estes
Represented By: Adam R Strauss
Represented By: Benjamin William Tarshish
Represented By: Edward Skipton
Represented By: James A Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?