Peakspeed, Inc. v. Emerson
Plaintiff: Peakspeed, Inc.
Defendant: Timothy Emerson
Case Number: 0:2020cv01630
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss, there is good cause to delay scheduling a pretrial conference at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/11/2020.(MSK)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/8/2020.(MSK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #29 Stipulation. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
September 8, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Peakspeed, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Timothy Emerson. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Timothy Emerson re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Timothy Emerson.(Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #21 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Timothy Emerson.(Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 EXHIBIT Exhibit Index re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #24 Declaration in Support, #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timothy Emerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Emerson Consulting LLC invoices to Emerson AI LLC, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Xilinx whitepaper entitled Versal: First Adaptive Compute Platform, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Service Provider Agreement between Oscar Kramer and EmersonAI, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Oscar Kramers invoices to EmersonAI, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Summary of invoices paid by EmersonAI from its Wells Fargo account, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - EmersonAI offer letter to Oscar Kramer dated Jan. 20, 2020, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - Service Provider Agreement between Matthew Baldin and EmersonAI, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - Matthew Baldins Invoices to EmersonAI, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - Joseph Greshiks Invoices to EmersonAI, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - Emails dated May 3, 2020 between Oscar Kramer and Dave Eaton, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - Email from Dave Eaton to Timothy Emerson and Dan Eaton dated July 1, 2020, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - Ltr. From Dave Eaton to Timothy Emerson dated July 6, 2020)(Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of Timothy Emerson in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Timothy Emerson.(Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Timothy Emerson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Timothy Emerson. (Evans, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon L Bjorklund on behalf of Peakspeed, Inc.. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Liimatainen Evans for Timothy Emerson. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/24/2020. (NAH)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Peakspeed, Inc.. (Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peakspeed, Inc..(Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christoper L. Evans. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7986450 filed by Timothy Emerson. (Van Tassel, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Timothy Emerson. (Van Tassel, Dawn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Reuter on behalf of Peakspeed, Inc.. (Reuter, Donna)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Payton E. George on behalf of Peakspeed, Inc.. (George, Payton)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/18/2020. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Peakspeed, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested (Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Timothy Emerson on 8/10/2020, filed by Peakspeed, Inc.. (Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Status Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAZ)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Granting Preliminary Injunction #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Dave Eaton in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Peakspeed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Peakspeed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Peakspeed, Inc.. (Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Zayed, R)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Timothy Emerson. (MKB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright/Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1630 (JRT/BRT). (MKB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Emerson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7911212) filed by Peakspeed, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zayed, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peakspeed, Inc. v. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peakspeed, Inc.
Represented By: R J Zayed
Represented By: Forrest Tahdooahnippah
Represented By: Payton E. George
Represented By: Donna Reuter
Represented By: Shannon L Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Emerson
Represented By: Christopher Liimatainen Evans
Represented By: Dawn C Van Tassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?