Carlson v. Schnell et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Jon Carlson
Defendant: William Bolin, Kris Rish, Crystal Hansen, Chad Clough, Paul Schnell and Darryl Goebel
Case Number: 0:2020cv01676
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JMK)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, though the Court will defer entering any service-related order until it reviews Carlson's amended complaint; denying without prejudice #4 Motion; granting in part and denying in part #10 request for appointed counsel; and denying as moot #14 second request for appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/28/2020. (ALM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE (OBJECTION) TO #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 9/1/2020. (kt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 EXHIBIT List re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(CLK)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER in Response to #14 letter from Joshua Jon Carlson dated 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/28/2020. (JMK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 RECEIPT number 44641108472 in the amount of $14.11 issued to Joshua Jon Carlson. (MTP) Document QC'd on 8/28/2020 (MMG).
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER TO THE COURT from Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd on 8/28/2020 (MMG).
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua Jon Carlson by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 8/21/20. (kt)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #9 MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/18/2020.(JMK)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: (A) Plaintiff Joshua Jon Carlson must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $14.11 within 20 days of this Order's date. Should Carlson fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, the Court will recommend dismissing this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (B) Carlson has 14 days from this Order's date to file a letter advising the Court whether the Court should (1) return to Carlson the materials he submitted on August 11, 2020; (2) discard those materials, or (3) file those materials in this action's docket. If Carlson elects the third option and believes some or all of those materials should be sealed, his letter must state specifically which of the materials should be sealed and why they should be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/18/2020.(JMK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 8/21/20. (kt)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 8/21/20. (kt)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBITS in support of #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Cover Letter, #8 Envelope). (lmb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachment: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Jon Carlson re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joshua Jon Carlson, #1 Prisoner Complaint, #3 Memorandum, #4 MOTION 1. For the immediate conditional release of all non-violent inmates. (JGK)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION 1. For the immediate conditional release of all non-violent inmates. 2. Independent investigation of Civil Rights violations of inmates. 3. Physical, Emotional, Mental Damages awarded to Joshua Jon Carlson. 4. Compensation to violation of protected rights of Joshua Carlson. 5. Compensation for preparing, building, organizing complaint. 6. Future Health coverage due to PTSD when Covid-19 becomes a pre-existing condition to deny health coverage. 7. Anti-Body tests done on all inmates. filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (JGK)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(JGK)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against William Bolin, Chad Clough, Darryl Goebel, Crystal Hansen, Kris Rish, Paul Schnell filed by Joshua Jon Carlson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s) Blank Notice of Appeal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Schnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jon Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Rish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Goebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?