Wright v. Frankie's Marine, LLC
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Defendant: Frankie's Marine, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01720
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jon Q. Wright. (Chadwick, Eric)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Chadwick, Eric)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Register of Copyrights Report on Filing an Action Regarding a Copyright (filing fee $ 47, receipt number AMNDC-7950559). (Chadwick, Eric) Modified text on 8/10/2020 (MMP).
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Frankie's Marine, LLC. (MKB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright/Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1720 (NEB/BRT). (MKB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frankie's Marine, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7947972) filed by Jon Q. Wright. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chadwick, Eric) Modified text on 8/6/2020 (MMP). cc: Copyright Office. Modified text on 8/7/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Frankie's Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie's Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Represented By: Eric H Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?