United States of America v. $69,258.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $69,258.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Dayton D Amotozio, Nicole M Amotozio and Donovan D Amotozio
Case Number: 0:2020cv01729
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CIVIL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/5/2020.(MSK)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Donovan D. Amotozio, Dayton D. Amotozio, and Nicole M. Amotozio. (Baune, Craig)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nicole M Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Donovan D Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Dayton D Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 Verified Claim for Seized Property filed by Dayton D Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (MMP).
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Verified Claim for Seized Property filed by Nicole M Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (MMP).
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Verified Claim for Seized Property filed by Donovan D Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (MMP).
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Donovan D Amotozio, Dayton D Amotozio, Nicole M Amotozio. (Olson, Stephen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM Returned Executed 4/20/2020 as to $69,258 in United States Currency. (MMG) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 8/21/20. (kt)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1729 (DWF/BRT). (MMP)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $69,258.00 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $69,258.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $69,258.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dayton D Amotozio
Represented By: Stephen J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nicole M Amotozio
Represented By: Stephen J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donovan D Amotozio
Represented By: Stephen J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?