Andrews v. Bacardi USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Andrews
Defendant: MullenLowe U.S., Inc. and Bacardi USA, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01785
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/8/2020.(KAT)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant MullenLowe U.S., Inc.. (Blofield, Tiffany)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by MullenLowe U.S., Inc.. (Blofield, Tiffany)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Bacardi USA, Inc.. (Blofield, Tiffany)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Bacardi USA, Inc.. (Blofield, Tiffany)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond. Bacardi USA, Inc. answer due 10/7/2020; MullenLowe U.S., Inc. answer due 10/7/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/4/2020.(KAT)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Blofield, Tiffany)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond Until October 7, 2020 by Bacardi USA, Inc., MullenLowe U.S., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Mark Andrews, p/k/a SisQo. (Blofield, Tiffany)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Andrews. MullenLowe U.S., Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Pham, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Andrews. Bacardi USA, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Pham, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Andrews. MullenLowe U.S., Inc. served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Pham, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bacardi USA, Inc., MullenLowe U.S., Inc. (MMP)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Mark Andrews. Filer requests summons issued. (Pham, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for 4 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney: This entry was filed in error-filed in wrong case. (lmb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-FILED IN WRONG CASE. Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David A. Koenigsberg, as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (lmb).
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bacardi USA, Inc., MullenLowe U.S., Inc.. (kt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1785 NEB/KMM. (kt)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7970616) filed by Mark Andrews. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pham, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Bacardi USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Andrews
Represented By: Christopher D Pham
Represented By: Laura L Myers
Represented By: Jessica Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MullenLowe U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Tucker A. Chambers
Represented By: Tiffany A Blofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacardi USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tucker A. Chambers
Represented By: Tiffany A Blofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?