Lucchesi-Bizzotto v. Saul
Plaintiff: Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv01796
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Andrew Saul served on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (MTP)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Andrew Saul served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Duncan, Dana)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (CLK)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/19/2020. (TJB)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dana W Duncan for Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/19/2020. (NAH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-1796 DTS. (MMG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana W. Duncan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7977829 filed by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. (Mrozik, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. (Mrozik, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul filed by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons and Complaint Atty General, #2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons and Complaint RCC, #3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons and Complaint US Atty, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mrozik, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucchesi-Bizzotto v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto
Represented By: Jennifer G Mrozik
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?