Zayo Group, LLC v. SRF Consulting Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Defendant: SRF Consulting Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01805
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda Michelle Lowe for Zayo Group, LLC; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anthony J. Jorgenson for Zayo Group, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/1/2020. (NAH)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony J. Jorgenson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8097485 filed by Zayo Group, LLC. (Leventhal, Seth)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda M. Lowe. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8097470 filed by Zayo Group, LLC. (Leventhal, Seth)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 10/20/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by SRF Consulting Group, Inc.. (Serdar, George)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of David C. Hansen re #5 Summons Issued, #8 Amended Complaint byZayo Group, LLC. (Leventhal, Seth)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SRF Consulting Group, Inc.. filed by Zayo Group, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Leventhal, Seth)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED COMPLAINT against SRF Consulting Group, Inc., filed by Zayo Group, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Leventhal, Seth) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (lmb).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/24/2020.(TJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SRF Consulting Group, Inc.. (kt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1805 NEB/DTS. (kt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth J S Leventhal on behalf of Zayo Group, LLC. (Leventhal, Seth)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Zayo Group, LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Zayo Group Holdings, Inc. (Leventhal, Seth) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (KDS).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SRF Consulting and not against Zayo Group, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7982709) filed by Zayo Group, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 MSA, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2 Service Order 5056, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leventhal, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayo Group, LLC v. SRF Consulting Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Seth J S Leventhal
Represented By: Anthony J. Jorgenson
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRF Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: George R Serdar
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?