Cuevas v. Ecolab Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Cuevas
Defendant: Ecolab Inc. and Does 1-100 inclusive
Case Number: 0:2020cv01807
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5 - ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/30/2020.(CLK)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sandra Cuevas. Ecolab Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Vercoski, Michele)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tuan Q. Nguyen on behalf of Sandra Cuevas. (Nguyen, Tuan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dale McCune, Jr on behalf of Sandra Cuevas. (McCune, Richard)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele M Vercoski on behalf of Sandra Cuevas. (Vercoski, Michele)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Does, Ecolab Inc. (CLK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1807 SRN/ECW. (CLK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does, Ecolab, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7983056) filed by Sandra Cuevas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Becker, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuevas v. Ecolab Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Cuevas
Represented By: Jacob Robert Rusch
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: Richard Dale McCune, Jr
Represented By: Tuan Q. Nguyen
Represented By: Michele M Vercoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?