Baylor v. Gildea et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Gary Baylor
Defendant: Tim Walz, Lorie Skjerven Gildea and Susan L. Segal
Case Number: 0:2020cv01811
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2020 Filing 11 Supplemental Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs in a Non-Prisoner Civil Case filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. (Baylor, Christopher)
October 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Christopher Gary Baylor re #3 Notice (Other) Second Cease and Desist Notice (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Baylor, Christopher)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF FOR OBJECTIONS TO ELIZABETH C. WRIGHT'S OPINION [ECF.08] filed by Christopher Gary Baylor.(Baylor, Christopher)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher Gary Baylor, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher Gary Baylor filed by Christopher Gary Baylor, 5 EX PARTE Motion For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in Court of Appeals filed by Christopher Gary Baylor Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/24/2020.(TMA)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. APPLICATION for Writ of Mandamus by Christopher Gary Baylor. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Certificate of Service)(Baylor, Christopher) Modified text on 9/15/2020 (MMG).
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED First AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Gary Baylor in SUPPORT OF 5 EX PARTE Motion For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in Court of Appeals and Supporting Affidavit filed by Christopher Baylor.(Baylor, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Christopher Gary Baylor is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Christopher Gary Baylor has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Christopher Gary Baylor (NAH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(NAH) Document QC'd on 8/26/2020 (MKB).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lorie Skjerven Gildea, Susan L. Segal, Tim Walz filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Envelope) (NAH) Document Qc'd on 8/26/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baylor v. Gildea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Skjerven Gildea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gary Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?