Abascal et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Paul Johnson, Rossel Ulloa, Gary Duke, Ronnie Whitehead, Ryan Bezick, Justin Dunlap, Bradley Parker, Dan Fuller, Jacob Ethridge, Sheila Barry, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Robert Arnett, Gregory Stone, David Romish, Robert Hopkins, Cory Wilson, Mitchell Alvarado, Donald Bunker, David Birch, Mark Elmore, Aaron Willis, Dennis Lietzow, Stanley Sanders, Randy Watts, Jarom Reeves, Chandler Byrd, Scott Hambly, Antonyo Wyche, Danny Alsobrooks, Zachery Griffin, Jorge Abascal, Darryl Brandon, Thomas Williams, Kyle Lindeman, Eric Risdal, Destin Lawler, David Barker, Rex Pendergrass, Walter Hartman, Scott Mcpherson, William Dees, Manuel Moreno, Melvin Hanneman, Mark Nute, Thomas Shoemake, John Mclain, Dan Biddle, Richard Roy, Lamar Islar, Andrew Wolfe, Michael Eskridge, William Guerrero-Pena, Terry Bailey, Pedro Lozano, Michael Root, Jon Hart, Michael Bell, Jon Rider, Jeffrey Reynolds, Timmithy Chapman, Paul Gates, Richard Harper, Denver Sizemore, Jamey Brown, Jerry Carpenter, Rafael Rico, Manroe Kemerling, Jeremy Clayton, William Bowman, Kenneth Clubine, Artie Peavler, Tim Turner, Joseph Boudreaux, Dave Hoefke, Kyle Beier, Michael Wofford, Aaron Petry, Darrell Barclay, Jose Garza, Zachariah Cornette, Steve Andrews, Kiajuana Beasley, Carlos Gordian, Richard Ferguson, Jeff Bowman, Charles Parrish, Anthony Mancabelli, Tony Lewis, Joshua Ford, Shone Curole, Joshua Domanek, Robert Granat, Mike McClamrock, Monroe Kemmerling and Cary Wilson
Defendant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01812
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-K)(Hulse, Benjamin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jorge Abascal, Danny Alsobrooks, Mitchell Alvarado, Steve Andrews, Robert Arnett, Terry Bailey, Darrell Barclay, David Barker, Sheila Barry, Kiajuana Beasley, Kyle Beier, Michael Bell, Ryan Bezick, Dan Biddle, David Birch, Joseph Boudreaux, Jeff Bowman, William Bowman, Darryl Brandon, Jamey Brown, Donald Bunker, Chandler Byrd, Jerry Carpenter, Timmithy Chapman, Jeremy Clayton, Kenneth Clubine, Zachariah Cornette, Shone Curole, William Dees, Joshua Domanek, Gary Duke, Justin Dunlap, Mark Elmore, Michael Eskridge, Jacob Ethridge, Richard Ferguson, Joshua Ford, Dan Fuller, Jose Garza, Paul Gates, Carlos Gordian, Robert Granat, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Scott Hambly, Melvin Hanneman, Richard Harper, Jon Hart, Walter Hartman, Dave Hoefke, Robert Hopkins, Lamar Islar, Paul Johnson, Monroe Kemmerling, Destin Lawler, Tony Lewis, Dennis Lietzow, Kyle Lindeman, Pedro Lozano, Anthony Mancabelli, Mike McClamrock, John Mclain, Scott Mcpherson, Manuel Moreno, Mark Nute, Bradley Parker, Charles Parrish, Artie Peavler, Rex Pendergrass, Aaron Petry, Jarom Reeves, Jeffrey Reynolds, Rafael Rico, Jon Rider, Eric Risdal, David Romish, Michael Root, Richard Roy, Stanley Sanders, Thomas Shoemake, Denver Sizemore, Gregory Stone, Tim Turner, Rossel Ulloa, Randy Watts, Ronnie Whitehead, Thomas Williams, Aaron Willis, Cary Wilson, Michael Wofford, Andrew Wolfe, Antonyo Wyche.(Gustafson, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,, filed by Jorge Abascal, Danny Alsobrooks, Mitchell Alvarado, Steve Andrews, Robert Arnett, Terry Bailey, Darrell Barclay, David Barker, Sheila Barry, Kiajuana Beasley, Kyle Beier, Michael Bell, Ryan Bezick, Dan Biddle, David Birch, Joseph Boudreaux, Jeff Bowman, William Bowman, Darryl Brandon, Jamey Brown, Donald Bunker, Chandler Byrd, Jerry Carpenter, Timmithy Chapman, Jeremy Clayton, Kenneth Clubine, Zachariah Cornette, Shone Curole, William Dees, Joshua Domanek, Gary Duke, Justin Dunlap, Mark Elmore, Michael Eskridge, Jacob Ethridge, Richard Ferguson, Joshua Ford, Dan Fuller, Jose Garza, Paul Gates, Carlos Gordian, Robert Granat, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Scott Hambly, Melvin Hanneman, Richard Harper, Jon Hart, Walter Hartman, Dave Hoefke, Robert Hopkins, Lamar Islar, Paul Johnson, Monroe Kemmerling, Destin Lawler, Tony Lewis, Dennis Lietzow, Kyle Lindeman, Pedro Lozano, Anthony Mancabelli, Mike McClamrock, John Mclain, Scott Mcpherson, Manuel Moreno, Mark Nute, Bradley Parker, Charles Parrish, Artie Peavler, Rex Pendergrass, Aaron Petry, Jarom Reeves, Jeffrey Reynolds, Rafael Rico, Jon Rider, Eric Risdal, David Romish, Michael Root, Richard Roy, Stanley Sanders, Thomas Shoemake, Denver Sizemore, Gregory Stone, Tim Turner, Rossel Ulloa, Randy Watts, Ronnie Whitehead, Thomas Williams, Aaron Willis, Cary Wilson, Michael Wofford, Andrew Wolfe, Antonyo Wyche.(Gustafson, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jorge Abascal, Danny Alsobrooks, Mitchell Alvarado, Steve Andrews, Robert Arnett, Terry Bailey, Darrell Barclay, David Barker, Sheila Barry, Kiajuana Beasley, Kyle Beier, Michael Bell, Ryan Bezick, Dan Biddle, David Birch, Joseph Boudreaux, Jeff Bowman, William Bowman, Darryl Brandon, Jamey Brown, Donald Bunker, Chandler Byrd, Jerry Carpenter, Timmithy Chapman, Jeremy Clayton, Kenneth Clubine, Zachariah Cornette, Shone Curole, William Dees, Joshua Domanek, Gary Duke, Justin Dunlap, Mark Elmore, Michael Eskridge, Jacob Ethridge, Richard Ferguson, Joshua Ford, Dan Fuller, Jose Garza, Paul Gates, Carlos Gordian, Robert Granat, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Scott Hambly, Melvin Hanneman, Richard Harper, Jon Hart, Walter Hartman, Dave Hoefke, Robert Hopkins, Lamar Islar, Paul Johnson, Monroe Kemmerling, Destin Lawler, Tony Lewis, Dennis Lietzow, Kyle Lindeman, Pedro Lozano, Anthony Mancabelli, Mike McClamrock, John Mclain, Scott Mcpherson, Manuel Moreno, Mark Nute, Bradley Parker, Charles Parrish, Artie Peavler, Rex Pendergrass, Aaron Petry, Jarom Reeves, Jeffrey Reynolds, Rafael Rico, Jon Rider, Eric Risdal, David Romish, Michael Root, Richard Roy, Stanley Sanders, Thomas Shoemake, Denver Sizemore, Gregory Stone, Tim Turner, Rossel Ulloa, Randy Watts, Ronnie Whitehead, Thomas Williams, Aaron Willis, Cary Wilson, Michael Wofford, Andrew Wolfe, Antonyo Wyche. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Gustafson, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jorge Abascal, Danny Alsobrooks, Mitchell Alvarado, Steve Andrews, Robert Arnett, Terry Bailey, Darrell Barclay, David Barker, Sheila Barry, Kiajuana Beasley, Kyle Beier, Michael Bell, Ryan Bezick, Dan Biddle, David Birch, Joseph Boudreaux, Jeff Bowman, William Bowman, Darryl Brandon, Jamey Brown, Donald Bunker, Chandler Byrd, Jerry Carpenter, Timmithy Chapman, Jeremy Clayton, Kenneth Clubine, Zachariah Cornette, Shone Curole, William Dees, Joshua Domanek, Gary Duke, Justin Dunlap, Mark Elmore, Michael Eskridge, Jacob Ethridge, Richard Ferguson, Joshua Ford, Dan Fuller, Jose Garza, Paul Gates, Carlos Gordian, Robert Granat, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Scott Hambly, Melvin Hanneman, Richard Harper, Jon Hart, Walter Hartman, Dave Hoefke, Robert Hopkins, Lamar Islar, Paul Johnson, Monroe Kemmerling, Destin Lawler, Tony Lewis, Dennis Lietzow, Kyle Lindeman, Pedro Lozano, Anthony Mancabelli, Mike McClamrock, John Mclain, Scott Mcpherson, Manuel Moreno, Mark Nute, Bradley Parker, Charles Parrish, Artie Peavler, Rex Pendergrass, Aaron Petry, Jarom Reeves, Jeffrey Reynolds, Rafael Rico, Jon Rider, Eric Risdal, David Romish, Michael Root, Richard Roy, Stanley Sanders, Thomas Shoemake, Denver Sizemore, Gregory Stone, Tim Turner, Rossel Ulloa, Randy Watts, Ronnie Whitehead, Thomas Williams, Aaron Willis, Cary Wilson, Michael Wofford, Andrew Wolfe, Antonyo Wyche. (Gustafson, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jorge Abascal, Danny Alsobrooks, Mitchell Alvarado, Steve Andrews, Robert Arnett, Terry Bailey, Darrell Barclay, David Barker, Sheila Barry, Kiajuana Beasley, Kyle Beier, Michael Bell, Ryan Bezick, Dan Biddle, David Birch, Joseph Boudreaux, Jeff Bowman, William Bowman, Darryl Brandon, Jamey Brown, Donald Bunker, Chandler Byrd, Jerry Carpenter, Timmithy Chapman, Jeremy Clayton, Kenneth Clubine, Zachariah Cornette, Shone Curole, William Dees, Joshua Domanek, Gary Duke, Justin Dunlap, Mark Elmore, Michael Eskridge, Jacob Ethridge, Richard Ferguson, Joshua Ford, Dan Fuller, Jose Garza, Paul Gates, Carlos Gordian, Robert Granat, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Scott Hambly, Melvin Hanneman, Richard Harper, Jon Hart, Walter Hartman, Dave Hoefke, Robert Hopkins, Lamar Islar, Paul Johnson, Manroe Kemerling, Destin Lawler, Tony Lewis, Dennis Lietzow, Kyle Lindeman, Pedro Lozano, Anthony Mancabelli, Mike McClamrock, John Mclain, Scott Mcpherson, Manuel Moreno, Mark Nute, Bradley Parker, Charles Parrish, Artie Peavler, Rex Pendergrass, Aaron Petry, Jarom Reeves, Jeffrey Reynolds, Rafael Rico, Jon Rider, Eric Risdal, David Romish, Michael Root, Richard Roy, Stanley Sanders, Thomas Shoemake, Denver Sizemore, Gregory Stone, Tim Turner, Rossel Ulloa, Randy Watts, Ronnie Whitehead, Thomas Williams, Aaron Willis, Cory Wilson, Michael Wofford, Andrew Wolfe, Antonyo Wyche filed by 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul, III and Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1812 JRT/KMM. (MMP)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7983770) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE (MISSING 1ST PAGE)#3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abascal et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossel Ulloa
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Duke
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Whitehead
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Bezick
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dunlap
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Parker
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Fuller
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ethridge
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Barry
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Green
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Greshik
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arnett
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stone
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Romish
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hopkins
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Alvarado
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bunker
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Birch
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Elmore
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Willis
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lietzow
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Sanders
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Watts
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarom Reeves
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandler Byrd
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hambly
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonyo Wyche
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Alsobrooks
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery Griffin
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Abascal
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Brandon
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Williams
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Lindeman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Risdal
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destin Lawler
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Barker
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Pendergrass
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Hartman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mcpherson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dees
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Moreno
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Hanneman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nute
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Shoemake
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mclain
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Biddle
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Roy
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Islar
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wolfe
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Eskridge
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Guerrero-Pena
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bailey
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Lozano
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Root
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Hart
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bell
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Rider
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Reynolds
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmithy Chapman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gates
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Harper
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Sizemore
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamey Brown
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Carpenter
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Rico
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manroe Kemerling
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Clayton
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bowman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Clubine
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artie Peavler
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Turner
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Boudreaux
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Hoefke
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Beier
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wofford
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Petry
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Barclay
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garza
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachariah Cornette
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Andrews
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiajuana Beasley
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gordian
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ferguson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bowman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Parrish
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mancabelli
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lewis
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ford
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shone Curole
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Domanek
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Granat
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike McClamrock
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe Kemmerling
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?