Sheriff v. Hersi et al
Plaintiff: Mustapha Sheriff
Defendant: Target, Millennium Hotel, Steven Community Apartment, Nic 1500, Mustapha Isaac, Sofia Hersi and Unknown Name
Case Number: 0:2020cv01816
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER to the Court filed by Mustapha Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION TO #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Mustapha Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP)
September 25, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: #5 Report and Recommendation. Document was refiled at #6 . (CLK)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mustapha Sheriff filed by Mustapha Sheriff, #1 Complaint, filed by Mustapha Sheriff, #4 MOTION to CALL WITNESS filed by Mustapha Sheriff Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/24/2020.(TMA)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mustapha Sheriff filed by Mustapha Sheriff, #1 Complaint, filed by Mustapha Sheriff, #4 MOTION to CALL WITNESS filed by Mustapha Sheriff Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/24/2020.(TMA) Modified text on 9/24/2020 (TMA).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to CALL WITNESS filed by Mustapha Sheriff. (NAH) Document QC'd on 9/28/2020 (CLK).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Mustapha Sheriff to Judge. (NAH) Document QC'd on 9/28/2020 (CLK).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mustapha Sheriff. (NAH) Document QC'd on 9/28/2020 (CLK).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sofia Hersi, Mustapha Isaac, Mustapha Isaac(Security Company One), Millennium Hotel, Nic 1500, Steven Community Apartment, Target, Unknown Name filed by Mustapha Sheriff. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH) Document QC'd on 9/28/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheriff v. Hersi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Community Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nic 1500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustapha Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sofia Hersi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Name
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustapha Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?