United States of America v. 2015 Jeep Renegade, VIN: ZACCJBBH9FPC08180
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2015 Jeep Renegade, VIN: ZACCJBBH9FPC08180 and 2015 Jeep Renegade
Claimant: Roberto Perez
Case Number: 0:2020cv01822
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 CLAIM VERIFIED filed by Roberto Perez. (Cascarano, Craig) Modified text/filer on 9/21/2020 (CLK).
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed as to 2015 Jeep Renegade. (KDS). Document QC'd on 9/2/2020 (MTP).
August 21, 2020 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1822 NEB/DTS. (KDS)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 2015 Jeep Renegade, VIN: ZACCJBBH9FPC08180 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2015 Jeep Renegade, VIN: ZACCJBBH9FPC08180
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Jeep Renegade, VIN: ZACCJBBH9FPC08180
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Jeep Renegade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Roberto Perez
Represented By: Craig E Cascarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?