Stone Arch Studio LLC v. Jaeb Designs Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stone Arch Studio LLC
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, John Doe, Mary Roe, Jaeb Designs Inc doing business as PenSimple and ABC Partnership
Counter Claimant: Jaeb Designs Inc
Case Number: 0:2020cv01834
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Jaeb Designs Inc. Jointly Signed by Stone Arch Studio, LLC. (Rodriguez, Henry)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ricardo Ruz for Jaeb Designs Inc. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/19/2020. (NAH)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ricardo Ruz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8146239 filed by Jaeb Designs Inc, Jaeb Designs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rodriguez, Henry)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - AFFIDAVIT of Ricardo Ruz in SUPPORT OF #17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ricardo Ruz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8138488 filed by Jaeb Designs Inc, Jaeb Designs Inc.(Rodriguez, Henry) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (NAH).
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ricardo Ruz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8138488 filed by Jaeb Designs Inc, Jaeb Designs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Rodriguez, Henry) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (NAH).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/NOTICE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 3/18/2021. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/12/2021. Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/14/2020.(MSK)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Fact Discovery due by 4/23/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 1/29/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 4/29/2021. Motions (disp) due by 8/24/2021. Ready for trial due by 12/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/14/2020.(MSK)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/7/2020. (MSK)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Stone Arch Studio LLC. Jointly Signed by Jaeb Designs Inc dba PenSimple.(Lutz, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE. REPORT Rule 26(f) by Stone Arch Studio LLC. (Lutz, David) Modified text on 10/1/2020 (MKB).
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Stone Arch Studio LLC. (Lutz, David)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Jaeb Designs Inc. (Rodriguez, Henry)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Rodriguez on behalf of Jaeb Designs Inc. (Rodriguez, Henry)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Stone Arch Studio LLC, filed by Jaeb Designs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D, #2 FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE-Notice of Appearance, #3 FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE-Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Certificate of Service). (Rodriguez, Henry) Modified text on 9/21/2020 (MKB). Modified text on 9/21/2020 (lmb).
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stone Arch Studio LLC. Jaeb Designs Inc served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Lutz, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ABC Partnership, John Doe, Jaeb Designs Inc, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. (lmb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1834 (PJS/BRT). (lmb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Lutz, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Stone Arch Studio LLC. (Lutz, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Partnership, John Doe, Jaeb Designs Inc, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7995066) filed by Stone Arch Studio LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lutz, David) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone Arch Studio LLC v. Jaeb Designs Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaeb Designs Inc doing business as PenSimple
Represented By: Henry Rodriguez
Represented By: Ricardo Ruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Arch Studio LLC
Represented By: David A Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jaeb Designs Inc
Represented By: Henry Rodriguez
Represented By: Ricardo Ruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?