McKenna v. Loonan et al
Plaintiff: Joseph McKenna and Joey, Inc.
Defendant: KMSP-TV, Rusco, Inc., KSTP-TV, KARE, Minnesota Shower and Bath, Michael Loonan and WCCO-TV
Case Number: 0:2020cv01837
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JMK)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.; denying as moot #11 Motion to Add Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/21/2020. (JMK)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against KARE, KMSP-TV, KSTP-TV, Michael Loonan, Joseph McKenna, Minnesota Shower and Bath, Rusco, Inc., WCCO-TV. filed by Joey, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KDS)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT PROOF OF INCOME TO CASE IFP re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph McKenna filed by Joseph McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Account Statements, #2 Envelope)(CLK)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER in Response to #12 Notice (Other), #11 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #9 Notice (Other). Second Amended Complaint due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/22/2020. (ALM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT ADDITIONAL INCOME TO CASE IFP re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF FACT AND RELIEF MODIFICATION by Joseph McKenna (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO ADD A DEFENDANT filed by Joseph McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Amended Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.) cc: Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (CLK).
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF FACTS by Joseph McKenna (Attachments: #1 Item 1, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (CLK).
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Joseph McKenna re #7 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (CLK).
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KARE, KMSP-TV, KSTP-TV, Michael Loonan, Minnesota Shower and Bath, Rusco, Inc. filed by Joseph McKenna. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CLK) Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (CLK).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding Petition and IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/26/2020. (JMK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachmeent: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (JMK).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk's Office to McKenna enclosing AO 121 Form. (Attachments: #1 AO 121 Form)(kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph McKenna. (JGK) Document QC'd on 9/28/2020 (CLK).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KARE, KMSP-TV, KSTP-TV, Michael Loonan, Minnesota Shower and Bath, Rusco, Inc., filed by Joey, Inc. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Copyright list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Item 1-8, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (JGK). Modified filer on 8/26/2020 (lmb). Document QC'd on 9/28/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenna v. Loonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMSP-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSTP-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Shower and Bath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Loonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCCO-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?