Chavez v. Renewal by Andersen LLC
Plaintiff: Jean-Carlo Chavez
Defendant: Renewal by Andersen LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01885
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Renewal by Andersen LLC. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Jean-Carlo Chavez.(Wilk, David)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/9/2020.(HAM)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in re dispositive motion practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 9/24/2020. (LLM)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Renewal by Andersen LLC. (Wilk, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1885 PAM/TNL. (kt)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Renewal by Andersen LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Certificate of Service)(Wilk, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, case number Unknown (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8023343) filed by Renewal by Andersen LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilk, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Renewal by Andersen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renewal by Andersen LLC
Represented By: David M Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Carlo Chavez
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?