Dubord v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cynthia Dubord
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv01886
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Cynthia Dubord. Cynthia Dubord served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Schneider, Mac)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (KDS)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/8/2020. (MSK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR. (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mac Schneider as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (CLK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-1886 BRT. (MMG)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Cynthia Dubord. (Schneider, Mac)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Cynthia Dubord. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schneider, Mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubord v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Dubord
Represented By: Mac Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?