Gilbert v. Dihle et al
Plaintiff: Gary George Gilbert and Gary G. Gilbert
Defendant: Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP, Gordon Dihle, William D Nelson, Corporate Legal LLC, Corporate Legal, LLC, Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP and William D. Nelson
Case Number: 0:2020cv01932
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-Only) On October 30, 2020, Plaintiff filed a letter asking the Court for an expedited ruling on his Motion for Service of Process by U.S. Marshal. (Letter #15 ). Oral arguments on Plaintiff's Motion are scheduled to be heard before the undersigned on December 16, 2020. (Notice of Hearing #14 ). After reviewing Plaintiff's Motion; the documents submitted in support thereof; and Plaintiff's October 30, 2020, letter, the Court believes that all procedural issues under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure raised by Plaintiff's Motion can be properly and adequately addressed at the December 16, 2020, Motions Hearing. Therefore, Plaintiffs request for an expeditated ruling is DENIED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/4/2020.(JLB)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gary G. Gilbert . (Taylor, F)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re #8 MOTION Direct U.S. Marshal to serve summons on Dihle; rule that CLL was properly served; award costs Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (FF) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois (Taylor, F) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (CLK).
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT P re #11 Declaration in Support, filed by Gary G. Gilbert.(Taylor, F)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Non-Compliance with #Local Rule 7.1 Civil Motion Practice for #8 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by attorney F Chet Taylor. No hearing secured for Motion. No Proposed Order filed in CM/ECF. Proposed Order not emailed to the Judge in word processing format. Please file according to the rule and contact the appropriate chambers if further direction is needed. (JLB)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of F Chet Taylor in Support of #8 MOTION Direct U.S. Marshal to serve summons on Dihle; rule that CLL was properly served; award costs filed by Gary G. Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - H, #2 Exhibit(s) I - M, #3 Exhibit(s) N, #4 Exhibit(s) O, #5 Exhibit(s) Q)(Taylor, F)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Gary G. Gilbert.(Taylor, F)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION Direct U.S. Marshal to serve summons on Dihle; rule that CLL was properly served; award costs filed by Gary G. Gilbert.(Taylor, F)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Direct U.S. Marshal to serve summons on Dihle; rule that CLL was properly served; award costs filed by Gary G. Gilbert. (Taylor, F)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John C. Gray for Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP and for William D. Nelson. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/14/2020. (NAH)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Gray. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8125894 filed by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP, William D. Nelson. (Asmus, Jason)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary G. Gilbert. Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Taylor, F)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary G. Gilbert. William D. Nelson waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Taylor, F)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corporate Legal, LLC, Gordon Dihle, Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP, William D. Nelson. (KDS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-1932 SRN/LIB. (KDS)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8047733) filed by Gary G. Gilbert. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, F) Modified text on 9/14/2020 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Dihle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Dihle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Legal LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Legal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
Represented By: John C. Gray
Represented By: Jason R Asmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Nelson
Represented By: John C. Gray
Represented By: Jason R Asmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary George Gilbert
Represented By: F Chet Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary G. Gilbert
Represented By: F Chet Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?