Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC v. Cristofono
Appellant: Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC
Appellee: Brian J Cristofono
Case Number: 0:2020cv01943
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Appeal from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/4/2020. (HAZ)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC re #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC.(Cobb, Jeremy)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-40994. Adversary Proceeding number 20-4094. Supplemental Memorandum filed by Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC. (Attachments: #1DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cobb, Jeremy) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (CLK).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #6 Letter to District Judge. Permission to file supplemental statement granted. Supplemental statement due by 10/29/2020. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/22/2020.(HAZ)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC Requesting Permission to File Supplemental Memorandum. (Cobb, Jeremy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL re #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-40994. Adversary Proceeding number 20-4094. (lmb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(sd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 8/27/2020. Court Reporter: Susan Newsom. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2020.(sd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Bankruptcy) list. Please use case number 20-cv-1943 JRT. (CLK)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-40994. Adversary Proceeding number 20-4094. filed by Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #3 Election to District Court, #4 Identification of Residence, #5 Adversary Docket, #6 Bankruptcy Docket, #7 Order on Appeal) (sd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC v. Cristofono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aneta Lennartson and Top Law, PLLC
Represented By: Jeremy J Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian J Cristofono
Represented By: Nathan M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?