Benjamin v. Rice County et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Benjamin
Defendant: Deputy James Ingham and Rice County
Case Number: 0:2020cv01986
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rice County. (Skelton, Margaret)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Benjamin. James Ingham served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Leyderman, Zorislav)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James Ingham, Rice County. (lmb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1986 (ECT/KMM). (lmb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Ingham, Rice County (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-8065085) filed by Elizabeth Benjamin. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leyderman, Zorislav) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Rice County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy James Ingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice County
Represented By: Margaret A Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Benjamin
Represented By: Jonathan K Reppe
Represented By: Zorislav R Leyderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?