Carson et al v. Simon
Plaintiff: Eric Lucero and James Carson
Defendant: Steve Simon
Intervenor Defendant: Mary Sansom, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Gary Severson, Robert LaRose and Teresa Maples
Case Number: 0:2020cv02030
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 12/9/2020.(KMW)
December 9, 2020 Filing 88 STIPULATION of Dismissal by James Carson, Eric Lucero. Jointly Signed by Steve Simon, Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson, and Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Educational Fund. (Foix, Danyll)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/16/2020. (HAM)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ON MOTION TO CERTIFY QUESTION TO MINNESOTA SUPREME COURT AND STAY PROCEEDINGS. The Emergency Motion to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings #78 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/5/2020. (KMW)
November 4, 2020 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re #78 Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Marisam, Jason)
November 4, 2020 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Foix, Danyll)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 (Text-Only) ORDER. Any response to the Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings is due by 11/4/20 at 8:00 a.m. The ruling will be made on the paper submissions. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/3/2020.(KMW)
November 3, 2020 Filing 82 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #78 Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson.(Dunlop, Sybil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 81 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #78 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson.(Dunlop, Sybil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support re #78 Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dunlop, Sybil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #78 Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings : Date and time to be determined. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 78 Emergency MOTION to Certify State Law Question and Stay Proceedings filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlinrose H. Fisher on behalf of Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Fisher, Caitlinrose)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 75 MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to #60 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (MKB)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/30/2020.(KMW)
October 29, 2020 Filing 74 USCA JUDGMENT (electronic copy) as to #60 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (MKB)
October 29, 2020 Filing 73 Opinion of USCA (electronic copy) as to #60 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (MKB)
October 19, 2020 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Memorandum in Opposition to Motion #68 , Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #69 , Declaration in Opposition, #70 , Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #71 . (MMP)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL. Based on the foregoing and on all the files, records, and proceedings herein, the Plaintiffs' emergency motion for injunction pending appeal #61 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/16/2020. (KMW)
October 15, 2020 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Abha Khanna in Opposition to #61 Emergency MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Dunlop, Sybil)
October 15, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #61 Emergency MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dunlop, Sybil)
October 15, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #61 Emergency MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Marisam, Jason)
October 14, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-3139 for #60 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (MKB)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David B. Rivkin for James Carson and for Eric Lucero. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/14/2020. (NAH)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Order on Motion for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission #67 . (MMP)
October 13, 2020 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Answer to Complaint #65 , Answer to Complaint #66 . (MMP)
October 13, 2020 Filing 66 Intervenor-Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
October 13, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Steve Simon. (Marisam, Jason)
October 13, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit #60 . (MMP)
October 12, 2020 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #61 Emergency MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero.(Foix, Danyll)
October 12, 2020 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 Emergency MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Foix, Danyll)
October 12, 2020 Filing 61 Emergency MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Foix, Danyll)
October 12, 2020 Filing 60 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #59 Order of Entry by James Carson, Eric Lucero. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMNDC-8131570. (Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (MKB).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Because the plaintiffs lack standing, the Court has no subject-matter jurisdiction and the motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/12/2020.(KMW)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO VACATE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/12/2020.(KMW)
October 12, 2020 Filing 57 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT #60 . NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #56 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by James Carson, Eric Lucero. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMNDC-8131477. (Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (MKB).
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 VACATED PER #58 ORDER DATED 10/12/20 - ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Because the plaintiffs lack standing, the Court has no subject-matter jurisdiction and the motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/11/2020. (KMW) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (MMP).
October 9, 2020 Filing 55 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson (response to plaintiffs' letter ECF 54). (Dunlop, Sybil)
October 8, 2020 Filing 54 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE with Attachment by James Carson, Eric Lucero . (Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 10/9/2020 (MMP).
October 8, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David B. Rivkin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8124515 filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Foix, Danyll)
October 7, 2020 Filing 52 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by James Carson, Eric Lucero . (Foix, Danyll)
October 7, 2020 Filing 51 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson . (Clark, Samuel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #48 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Clark, Samuel)
October 7, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION - DUPLICATE ENTRY OF #48 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN ERROR docket entry #49 Transcript.(MMP)
October 6, 2020 Filing 49 DUPLICATE ENTRY OF TRANSCRIPT #48 PER COURT REPORTER FILED IN ERROR - TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/2/2020 before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (72 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 10/13/2020. Redaction Request due 10/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2021. (EDD) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (MMP).
October 6, 2020 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/2/2020 before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (72 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 10/13/2020. Redaction Request due 10/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2021. (EDD)
October 5, 2020 Filing 47 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Foix, Danyll)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda Callais for Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, and for Gary Severson. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/5/2020. (NAH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2020 re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson and Eric Lucero. The motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW)
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Foix, Danyll)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text-Only) ORDER IN RESPONSE TO EXCEED WORD COUNT LIMIT. Ten minutes prior to their filing deadline, the Plaintiffs have requested a word-count exemption under Local Rule 7.1(f)(1)(B) #41 , which requires the Court's prior permission to exceed the maximum word count. At the same time, Plaintiffs filed their overlength brief #42 . Plaintiffs in this case, having requested the expedited briefing schedule and agreed to the intervenors, could have anticipated the necessity of an overlength brief. Their request does not comport with the Local Rules, and ECF No. 42 will be stricken from the record. The Plaintiffs shall file a brief within the word limits set by Local Rule 7.1. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/1/2020.(KMW)
October 1, 2020 Filing 42 STRICKEN PER 43 TEXT ONLY ORDER DATED 10/1/2020 - REPLY re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Proposed Certificate of Compliance)(Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 10/1/2020 (MMP).
October 1, 2020 Filing 41 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Reply, #2 Exhibit(s) B Proposed Rule 7.1 Certificate)(Foix, Danyll)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Michael Grossman for James Carson and for Eric Lucero; granting #8 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Bryan Raile for James Carson and for Eric Lucero. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/29/2020. (NAH)
September 29, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Abha Khanna in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-29)(Dunlop, Sybil)
September 29, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dunlop, Sybil)
September 29, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION of David Maeda re #35 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Steve Simon . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Marisam, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Jason Marisam re #35 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Steve Simon . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-E)(Marisam, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Marisam, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marc E Elias for Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, and for Gary Severson; granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Patrick Hawley for Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, and for Gary Severson; granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Abha Khanna for Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, and for Gary Severson; granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Will McDonell Conley for Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, and for Gary Severson. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/29/2020. (NAH)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/28/2020. (KMW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #20 Motion to Intervene filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson.(Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abha Khanna. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8090686 filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Hawley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8090683 filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc E. Elias. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8090678 filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Will M. Conley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8090666 filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda R. Callais. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8090661 filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel J Clark on behalf of Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Clark, Samuel)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sybil L Dunlop on behalf of Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson.(Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 23 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #20 Motion to Intervene filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson.(Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) 1)(Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #20 MOTION to Intervene : Date and time to be determined. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund. (Dunlop, Sybil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2020 at 12:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. The parties will receive a notice for the video connection. The public can call: 669-254-5252. Meeting ID 161 292 8098 Passcode 498882073. The response is due 9/29/20. The reply is due by 12:00 p.m. central time on 10/1/20. (KMW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2020 at 12:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Foix, Danyll)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero.(Foix, Danyll)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Eric Lucero in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero.(Foix, Danyll)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of James Carson in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero.(Foix, Danyll)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Danyll W. Foix in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero.(Foix, Danyll)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Foix, Danyll)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Foix, Danyll)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. Steve Simon served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Foix, Danyll)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION Motion for Permission for a Non-resident to Serve as Local Counsel filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero.(Foix, Danyll)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David B. Rivkin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8081657 filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 9/29/2020 (NAH).
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard B. Raile. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8081613 filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Foix, Danyll)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew M. Grossman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8081570 filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Foix, Danyll)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - Motion for Permission for a Non-resident to Serve as Local Counsel filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. (Attachments: ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #1 Proposed Order)(Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (MMP). Modified text on 9/23/2020 (MMP). Modified text on 9/24/2020 (NAH).
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Marisam on behalf of Steve Simon. (Marisam, Jason)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David B. Rivkin, Andrew M. Grossman, Richard B. Raile as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Steve Simon. (MKB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2030 (NEB/TNL). (MKB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steve Simon (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8078226) filed by James Carson, Eric Lucero. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Foix, Danyll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson et al v. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lucero
Represented By: Danyll Foix
Represented By: Nathan M Hansen
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: David B. Rivkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carson
Represented By: Danyll Foix
Represented By: Nathan M Hansen
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: David B. Rivkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simon
Represented By: Jason Marisam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Mary Sansom
Represented By: Samuel J Clark
Represented By: Will McDonell Conley
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund
Represented By: Samuel J Clark
Represented By: Will McDonell Conley
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Gary Severson
Represented By: Samuel J Clark
Represented By: Will McDonell Conley
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Robert LaRose
Represented By: Samuel J Clark
Represented By: Will McDonell Conley
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Teresa Maples
Represented By: Samuel J Clark
Represented By: Will McDonell Conley
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?