Panning v. County to State
Plaintiff: Jay Panning and Jay Charles Panning
Defendant: County to State
Case Number: 0:2020cv02043
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jay Charles Panning (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jay Charles Panning (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to County to State. (MTP)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED: Summons Issued as to County to State. (MTP) Modified text on 10/23/2020 (MTP).
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED: Summons Issued as to County to State. (MTP) Modified text on 10/23/2020 (MTP).
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIPT number 44641108984 in the amount of $400 issued to Jay Charles Panning. (MTP)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jay Panning. (JGK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County to State filed by Jay Panning. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panning v. County to State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Panning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Charles Panning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County to State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?