Craig et al v. Simon
Plaintiff: Angela Craig and Jenny Winslow Davies
Defendant: Steve Simon
Intervenor Defendant: Tyler Kistner
Case Number: 0:2020cv02066
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 72 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Answer to Complaint #71 . (CLK)
November 25, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Steve Simon. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
November 20, 2020 Filing 70 USCA JUDGMENT (electronic copy) as to #50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Tyler Kistner. (MTP)
November 20, 2020 Filing 69 Opinion of USCA (electronic copy) as to #50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Tyler Kistner. (MTP)
November 9, 2020 Filing 68 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction #67 . (CLK)
November 6, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies re #64 Transcript,,,,, . Attn: Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Nauen, Charles)
November 2, 2020 Filing 66 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Transcript #64 , Order Reassigning Case #65 . (CLK)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 20-cv-2250 (MJD/ECW) has been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/30/2020.(MKB)
October 30, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/7/2020 before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (57 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 11/6/2020. Redaction Request due 11/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2021. (LAS)
October 29, 2020 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited Daily Transcript (by 8am following day) of #48 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Nauen, Charles)
October 23, 2020 Filing 62 Opinion of USCA (electronic copy) as to #50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Tyler Kistner. (kt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 61 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On October 16, 2020, Defendant Steve Simon filed a motion to stay the deadline #59 to respond to the complaint until 14 days after Intervenor-Defendant Tyler Kistner's pending interlocutory appeal has concluded. Plaintiffs do not oppose Simon's motion. In light of the pending appeal, Simon's motion to stay the deadline to respond to the complaint #59 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Simon's answer to Plaintiffs' complaint shall be filed no later than 7 days after the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit has ruled on Kistner's interlocutory appeal of this Court's order granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/19/2020. (RJE)
October 19, 2020 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Judgment #61 , Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 60 , Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #59 . (CLK)
October 16, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Steve Simon. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 58 USCA Case Number 20-3126 for #50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit. (kt) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (kt).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On October 9, 2020, Intervenor-Defendant Tyler Kistner moved to stay #51 this Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #49 . Motions to stay an injunction are governed by Rule 62, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 8, Fed. R. App. P. A party seeking a stay pending appeal must demonstrate four factors, the most important being that they are likely to succeed on the merits of their claim. Brakebill v. Jaeger, 905 F.3d 553, 557 (8th Cir. 2018). As discussed in detail in this Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #49 , Plaintiffs have demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits of their claim that Minnesota Statutes Section 204B.13 is preempted by federal law. Because this Court concludes Plaintiffs are likely to succeed on the merits of their claim, this Court concludes that Kistner is not likely to succeed on the merits of his appeal. Therefore, Kistner's motion to stay this Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #51 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/13/2020. (RJE)
October 13, 2020 Filing 56 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit #50 . (MMP)
October 13, 2020 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Order on Motion to Stay 57 . (MMP)
October 9, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #51 MOTION to Stay re #49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene : Date and time to be determined. (LeBeau, Rondell)
October 9, 2020 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #51 MOTION to Stay re #49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner.(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 9, 2020 Filing 53 Declaration of William Grant in Support of #51 MOTION to Stay re #49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner.(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 9, 2020 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Stay re #49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 9, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Stay re #49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner. (LeBeau, Rondell)
October 9, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene by Tyler Kistner. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMNDC-8129695. (LeBeau, Rondell)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (See order for details) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/9/2020. (RJE)
October 7, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2020 re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jenny Winslow Davies, Angela Craig, #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE)
October 6, 2020 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Tim Davis in Opposition to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Tyler Kistner.(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Tyler Kistner's Motion for Leave to Call Witness #43 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Kistner may not present a witness to testify at the October 7, 2020 motion hearing. Kistner may, however, file a witness affidavit on ECF no later than 2:00 p.m. on October 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/6/2020. (JSN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION Leave to Call Witness re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nauen, Charles)
October 5, 2020 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #43 MOTION Leave to Call Witness re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Tyler Kistner.(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 5, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION Leave to Call Witness re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Tyler Kistner. (LeBeau, Rondell)
October 5, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #41 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #39 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nauen, Charles)
October 2, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Tyler Kistner. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 2, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Nathan J. Hartshorn in Opposition to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Hartshorn, Nathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hartshorn, Nathan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 38 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Nauen, Charles)
October 1, 2020 Filing 37 EXHIBIT A re #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner.(LeBeau, Rondell)
October 1, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #24 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (LeBeau, Rondell)
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Rondell Reid LeBeau, II on behalf of Tyler Kistner. (LeBeau, Rondell)
October 1, 2020 Filing 34 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies.(Nauen, Charles)
October 1, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies re #19 Declaration in Support, #17 Declaration in Support, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #20 Proposed Order to Judge, #21 Briefing Order, #15 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Declaration in Support (Nauen, Charles)
October 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J Hartshorn on behalf of Steve Simon. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On September 30, 2020, Tyler Kistner moved to intervene in this case #24 . Kistner shall file a brief by Friday, October 2, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., addressing his position as to the pending motion for preliminary injunction #14 . Plaintiffs may respond to Kistner's position in their reply brief, if any, which is due by Monday, October 5, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., as outlined in the briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #21 . Plaintiffs, Defendant Steve Simon, and Kistner will be permitted to argue at the hearing on the pending motion for preliminary injunction scheduled for Wednesday, October 7, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/1/2020. (SMP)
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Nashoba Pachito on behalf of Tyler Kistner. (Pachito, Benjamin)
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K Holth on behalf of Tyler Kistner. (Holth, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner.(Holth, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #24 Motion to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner.(Holth, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Holth, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #24 MOTION to Intervene : Date and time to be determined. (Holth, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Kistner. (Attachments: #1DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DIRECTED TO REFILE. Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Proposed Answer)(Holth, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/1/2020 (CLK).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marc E Elias for Angela Craig and for Jenny Winslow Davies; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joel J. Ramirez for Angela Craig and for Jenny Winslow Davie; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton for Angela Craig and for Jenny Winslow Davies; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Holly Marie Simpkins for Angela Craig and for Jenny Winslow Davies; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Laura Hill for Angela Craig and for Jenny Winslow Davies; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nitika Arora for Angela Craig and for Jenny Winslow Davies. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/30/2020. (NAH)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to #21 Motion Hearing on 10/7/2020 at 9:00 AM.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 1-888-204-5984. Use access code 1650161 and security code 2580. (RJE)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (See order for dates and details). Motion Hearing is set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Dial-in instructions will be sent to counsel via email. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/29/2020. (RJE)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies.(Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Charles N. Nauen in Support of #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2)(Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Jenny Winslow Davies in Support of #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies.(Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 Declaration of Angela Craig in Support of #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies.(Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nitika Arora. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8095365 filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura C. Hill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8095362 filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly M. Simpkins. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8095359 filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8095356 filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joel J. Ramirez. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8095353 filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc E. Elias. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8095352 filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Nauen, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Marc Erik Elias, Joel J. Ramirez, Kevin J. Hamilton, Holly M. Simpkins, Laura C. Hill, Nitika Arora as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steve Simon. (MMG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2066 WMW/TNL. (MMG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Ann Kitze Collins on behalf of Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Kitze Collins, Rachel)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Zoll on behalf of Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. (Zoll, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Steve Simon (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8094719) filed by Angela Craig, Jenny Winslow Davies. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nauen, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig et al v. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Craig
Represented By: Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Represented By: David J Zoll
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Joel J. Ramirez
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Nitika Arora
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Laura Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Winslow Davies
Represented By: Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Represented By: David J Zoll
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Joel J. Ramirez
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Nitika Arora
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Laura Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simon
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Represented By: Nathan J Hartshorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Tyler Kistner
Represented By: Jeffrey K Holth
Represented By: Benjamin Nashoba Pachito
Represented By: Rondell Reid LeBeau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?