Richard Goettle, Inc. v. Kevitt Excavating, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Goettle, Inc.
Defendant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC doing business as Kevitt Companies and Granite Re, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02068
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Luke John Busam for Richard Goettle, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/6/2020. (NAH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Luke Busam. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8108485 filed by Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Ritchie, Lauren)
October 2, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ritchie on behalf of Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Ritchie, Lauren)
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Rene Rush Danielson on behalf of Granite Re, Inc.. (Danielson, Lindsey)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Gregerson on behalf of Granite Re, Inc.. (Gregerson, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A Sullivan on behalf of Kevitt Excavating, LLC. (Sullivan, Timothy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Luke John Busam, Earl K Messer, Heather MacGregor Hawkins, Jesse R Lipcius, Reuel D Ash as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) cc: Luke John Busam, Earl K Messer, Heather MacGregor Hawkins, Jesse R Lipcius, Reuel D Ash. (kt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00829. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per 3rd/4th Master List.
September 29, 2020 Case transferred to District of Minnesota. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Minnesota (Doc. #6 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/25/2020. (rrs) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Counter Defendant Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Busam, Luke) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM < filed by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jlw). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS Kevitt Excavating, LLC's Counterclaim (doc. #10 ) by Counter Defendant Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Busam, Luke) Modified docket text on 11/7/2019 (eh). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Joinder ---Joinder of Defendant Kevitt's Motion to Transfer, #6 MOTION to Transfer Joinder of Reply Memorandum filed by Kevitt in support of its Motion to Transfer, filed by Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Richard Goettle, Inc., Goettle Holding Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Goettle Holding Company, Inc. for Richard Goettle, Inc... (Busam, Luke) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ash, Reuel) Modified to clarify docket text on 10/23/2019 (jlw). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint Defendant Granite Re, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard Goettle, Inc. filed by Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2 to Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 3 to Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit 4 to Counterclaim) (Messer, Earl) Modified on 10/23/2019 (jlw). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather MacGregor Hawkins for Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC. (Hawkins, Heather) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Joinder ---Joinder of Defendant Kevitt's Motion to Transfer, #6 MOTION to Transfer filed by Plaintiff Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Busam, Luke) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder ---Joinder of Defendant Kevitt's Motion to Transfer by Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Judicial Caseload Profiles, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order C- Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (Messer, Earl)[Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines re doc. #5 : Granite Re, Inc. answer due 10/22/2019; Kevitt Excavating, LLC. answer due 10/22/2019. (eh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl K Messer for Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC. (Messer, Earl) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Richard C. Richmond, III (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Granite Re, Inc., Kevitt Excavating, LLC., filed by Richard Goettle, Inc. in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas case A1904075. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1904075 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7132812), filed by Granite Re, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Ash, Reuel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Goettle, Inc. v. Kevitt Excavating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Goettle, Inc.
Represented By: Luke John Busam
Represented By: Lauren Ritchie
Represented By: Thomas J Vollbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC doing business as Kevitt Companies
Represented By: Kyle R Hardwick
Represented By: Timothy A Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Gregerson
Represented By: Lindsey Rene Rush Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC
Represented By: Kyle R Hardwick
Represented By: Timothy A Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?