Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc. v. Sterling Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc.
Defendant: Sterling Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv02075
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION: The Pretrial Notice and Order #11 was FILED IN ERROR. Please refer to the Pretrial Notice and Order #13 for document submission deadlines. (JLB)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc.. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE** PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB) Modified text on 11/5/2020 (JLB).
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc.. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Sterling Technology, Inc.. (Post, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc.. filed by Sterling Technology, Inc.. (Post, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - 1. The parties' Stipulation #5 is APPROVED; 2. The Amended Complaint, attached to the parties' Stipulation as Docket No. 5-1, shall serve as the operative complaint in this proceeding; and 3. Defendant Sterling Technology, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before October 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/7/2020.(JLB)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Mills, Amanda)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION by Sterling Technology, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc. and Sterling Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mills, Amanda)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Redacted Exhibit 1-1 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sterling Technology, Inc.. (Post, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Sixth Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-2075 SRN/LIB. (kt)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sterling Technology, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, attached Exhibits A and B; and Civil Cover Sheet (Post, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Defendant Sterling Technology, Inc. from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-20-11226 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8098684) filed by Sterling Technology, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Post, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc. v. Sterling Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stickney Hill Dairy, Inc.
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W Post
Represented By: Amanda S Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?