Creekmore v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kasey Creekmore
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 0:2020cv02076
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kasey Creekmore. Unum Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Cartier, Katelyn)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (MMG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2076 DSD/TNL. (MMG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8099852) filed by Kasey Creekmore. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cartier, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creekmore v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Creekmore
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Represented By: Katelyn Rae Cartier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?