Zajac v. Statton et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Robert John Zajac and Robert Zajac
Defendant: Maria K Statton, Cheryl L Bailey, Patricia J Lindholm, Pamela G Chawla, Jennifer Y Kendall-Thomas, Kimberly W Spaulding, Christopher Burkle, Hugh P Renier, Allen G Rasmussen, John M Manahan, Shaunequa B James, Kathryn D Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Maria K. Statton, Allen G. Rasmussen, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Kathryn D. Lombardo, Stuart T. Williams, Hugh P. Reiner, Patricia J. Lindholm, Cheryl L. Bailey, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas and Kimberly W. Spaulding
Case Number: 0:2020cv02148
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/19/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/19/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings may not appear on the kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(TJB)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cheryl L. Bailey, Christopher Burkle, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas, Patricia J. Lindholm, Kathryn D. Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Allen G. Rasmussen, Hugh P. Reiner, Kimberly W. Spaulding, Maria K. Statton, Stuart T. Williams.(Ghreichi, Kathleen)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Cheryl L. Bailey, Christopher Burkle, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas, Patricia J. Lindholm, Kathryn D. Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Allen G. Rasmussen, Hugh P. Reiner, Kimberly W. Spaulding, Maria K. Statton, Stuart T. Williams.(Ghreichi, Kathleen)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cheryl L. Bailey, Christopher Burkle, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas, Patricia J. Lindholm, Kathryn D. Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Allen G. Rasmussen, Hugh P. Reiner, Kimberly W. Spaulding, Maria K. Statton, Stuart T. Williams. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ghreichi, Kathleen)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 First MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined filed by Cheryl L. Bailey, Christopher Burkle, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas, Patricia J. Lindholm, Kathryn D. Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Allen G. Rasmussen, Hugh P. Reiner, Kimberly W. Spaulding, Maria K. Statton, Stuart T. Williams. (Ghreichi, Kathleen) Modified text on 12/4/2020 (MKB).
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cheryl L. Bailey, Christopher Burkle, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas, Patricia J. Lindholm, Kathryn D. Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Allen G. Rasmussen, Hugh P. Reiner, Kimberly W. Spaulding, Maria K. Statton, Stuart T. Williams. (Ghreichi, Kathleen)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M Ghreichi on behalf of All Defendants. (Ghreichi, Kathleen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Robert Zajac. (Simon, Jacques)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacques G. Simon for Robert Zajac. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/23/2020. (NAH)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacques G. Simon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8164055 filed by Robert Zajac. (Haddy, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT Plaintiff Signed verification re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Zajac. (Haddy, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hugh P. Reiner. (MMP)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jacques G. Simon as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kimberly W. Spaulding, Maria K. Statton, Stuart T. Williams. (MMP)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cheryl L. Bailey, Christopher Burkle, Pamela Gigi, Shaunequa B. James, Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas, Patricia J. Lindholm, Kathryn D. Lombardo, John M. (Jake) Manahan, Allen G. Rasmussen, High P. Renier. (MMP)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-2148 (JRT/DTS). (MMP)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8131903) filed by Robert John Zajac. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haddy, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zajac v. Statton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria K Statton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia J Lindholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela G Chawla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Y Kendall-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly W Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Burkle
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh P Renier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen G Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Manahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaunequa B James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn D Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. (Jake) Manahan
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria K. Statton
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen G. Rasmussen
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Gigi
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaunequa B. James
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn D. Lombardo
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart T. Williams
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh P. Reiner
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia J. Lindholm
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L. Bailey
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Y. Kendall Thomas
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly W. Spaulding
Represented By: Kathleen M Ghreichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Robert John Zajac
Represented By: Bradley John Haddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zajac
Represented By: Jacques G. Simon
Represented By: Bradley John Haddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?