Kristen N. Cooley v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kristen N. Cooley
Defendant: Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc. and John Does
Case Number: 0:2020cv02152
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 88 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Howard N Wisnia, Bradley E Beckworth, Cody L. Hill, Jeffrey J. Angelovich, Lisa P. Baldwin, Noah S. Cunningham, Ross Leonondakis, Susan Whatley, J Michael Keyes, Kent J Schmidt as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) cc: Howard N Wisnia, Bradley E Beckworth, Cody L. Hill, Jeffrey J. Angelovich, Lisa P. Baldwin, Noah S. Cunningham, Ross Leonondakis, Susan Whatley.
October 13, 2020 Filing 87 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:20-cv-00876. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark List.
October 13, 2020 Filing 86 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 85 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #66 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the District of Minnesota. Case electronically sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 84 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. Before the Court is Defendant Target Corporation et al.s (Defendant) Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Dismiss (Motion) #66 . The Court finds this matter suitable for resolution without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Having reviewed the moving papers and considered the parties arguments, the Court GRANTS the Motion and hereby transfers this case to the District of Minnesota. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 83 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets a VIDEO Scheduling Conference for 2:00 p.m. on OCTOBER 13, 2020. More info will follow for the video conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY. [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 82 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference and the Motion to Transfer #66 to OCTOBER 13, 2020 at 2:00 PM for an in-person hearing. The Court will meet counsel outside of the courthouse doors. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 81 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court advances the Scheduling Conference and the Motion to Transfer #66 to OCTOBER 13, 2020 at 7:30 AM for an in-person hearing. The Court will meet counsel outside of the courthouse doors. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 80 Text Only Entry The parties have filed a Stipulation regarding Electronic Discovery. Dkt. 78-1. The parties may agree to the procedures for producing electronic discovery in this action, but the Court declines to make the Stipulation an order of the Court. re #78 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mba) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROTECTIVE ORDER [Note Changes by the Court] by Magistrate Judge John D. Early re Notice of Lodging Proposed Stipulated Protective Order #77 . (see document for details) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Stipuated Electronic Discovery Order re Report #73 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Electronic Discovery Order)(Bjorklund, Shannon) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Stipulated Protective Order re Report #73 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Bjorklund, Shannon) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (rrp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 75 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter : The MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #66 set for 8/24/2020 at 8:30 AM is continued to 10/19/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The duplicate MOTION to Transfer Case #60 is stricken and removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #66 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 73 RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Howard N. Wisnia in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Kristen N. Cooley in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #66 (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #66 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 67 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Melissa Jungbauer in Support of Motion to Transfer, or in the Alternative, Dismiss Case re Declaration (Motion related), #62 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #65 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc..(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #58 by Judge David O. Carter: The Court hereby orders folows: The document identified below, which will be filed in support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer or, in the alternative, to Dismiss, may be filed under seal. See order for further details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Shannon Bjorklund in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Melissa Jungbauer in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #60 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 59 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit to Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer / Dismiss under seal #58 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 58 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit to Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer / Dismiss under seal filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #46 Non-Resident Attorney Shannon L. Bjorklund APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Target Corporation and Target Enterprise, Inc., Defendants, designating Kent J. Schmidt as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 56 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS #49 . Defendants are free to refile this motion or otherwise answer the complaint after a proper meet and confer has occurred and no later than July 27, 2020. Please note that allmotions must be set to be heard on a Monday. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 55 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Melissa Jungbauer in Support of Motion to Transfer, or in the Alternative, Dismiss Case re Declaration (Motion related), #51 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #54 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc..(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #47 APPLICATION For Leave to File Under Seal. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 53 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., identifying Target Entreprise, Inc., Target Corporation, Kristin N. Cooley, Plaintiff's Counsel. (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Shannon Bjorklund in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #49 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Melissa Jungbauer in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #49 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case #49 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 (STRICKEN PER 7/14/2020 MINUTES, DOCKET NO. 56). NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota or, in the Alternative Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keyes, J) Modified on 7/14/2020 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 48 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit to Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer / Dismiss under seal #47 filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 47 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit to Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer / Dismiss under seal filed by Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A)(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shannon L. Bjorklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27106484) filed by Defendant Target Corporation and Target Enterprise, Inc. Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Appear PHV) (Schmidt, Kent) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kent J Schmidt counsel for Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. Adding Kent J. Schmidt as counsel of record for Target Corporation and Target Enterprise, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Target Corporation and Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attorney Kent J Schmidt added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kent J Schmidt added to party Target Enterprise, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Kent) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Target Enterprise, Inc. answer now due 7/10/2020; Target Corporation answer now due 7/10/2020, filed by Defendants Target Enterprise, Inc.; Target Corporation.(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P. Baldwin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel; granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P. Baldwin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #35 Non-Resident Attorney Bradley E. Beckworth APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel; granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Bradley E. Beckworth APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney Susan Whatley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel; granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Susan Whatley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #32 Non-Resident Attorney Ross Leonoudakis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. ; granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Ross Leonoudakis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Cody L. Hill APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. ; granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Cody L. Hill APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Angelovich APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. ; granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Angelovich APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen N. Cooley, guardian of the estate of Nolan Ocean Cooley, a minor, designating Nicole S. Cunningham as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Michael Keyes counsel for Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc.. Adding J. Michael Keyes as counsel of record for Target Corporation and Target Enterprise, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Target Corporation and Target Enterprise, Inc.. (Attorney J Michael Keyes added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney J Michael Keyes added to party Target Enterprise, Inc.(pty:dft))(Keyes, J) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 36 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P. Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509347) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 35 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradley E. Beckworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509160) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 34 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P. Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509347) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 33 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan Whatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496983) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 32 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ross Leonoudakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496937) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 31 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cody L. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496863) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 30 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Angelovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/20/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496802) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P. Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509347) #24 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradley E. Beckworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509160) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an APPLICATION, not EX PARTE. Local counsel lists LA address, but CSB and CM have local counsel in San Diego. Failed to submit GSC for NY or Declaration.. (Thrasher, Lupe) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cody L. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496863) #19 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Angelovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496802) #18 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ross Leonoudakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496937) #20 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan Whatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496983) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an APPLICATION, not EX PARTE. Local counsel lists LA address, but CSB and CM have local counsel in San Diego.. (Thrasher, Lupe) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley, upon Defendant Target Enterprise, Inc. served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley, upon Defendant Target Corporation served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 24 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P. Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509347) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradley E. Beckworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26509160) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of attached document identifies N.O.C., a minor In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan Whatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496983) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ross Leonoudakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496937) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cody L. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496863) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Angelovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26496802) filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole S Cunningham on behalf of Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Attorney Nicole S Cunningham added to party Kristen N. Cooley (pty:pla))(Cunningham, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Kristen N. Cooley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susan Whatley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ross Leonoudakis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lisa P Baldwin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Angelovich. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cody L Hill. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bradley E Beckworth. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kristen N Cooley. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kristen N Cooley. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristen N Cooley, (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kristen N Cooley. (Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26399322 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kristen N Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Howard N Wisnia added to party Kristen N Cooley(pty:pla))(Wisnia, Howard) [Transferred from California Central on 10/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristen N. Cooley v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Shannon L Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen N. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?