Faust v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scott Faust
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv02171
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 11/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/8/2020. (HAM)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/8/2020. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/16/2020. (HAM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Crawford, John)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Auto-Owners Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, [Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal] (Crawford, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of John R. Crawford re #1 Notice of Removal, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company by Owners Insurance Company [not Auto-Owners]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Crawford, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2171 (PAM/TNL). (MMP)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Crawford, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court, case number 19HA-CV-20-3241 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8141333) filed by Owners Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED - #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crawford, John) Modified text on 10/15/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faust v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Faust
Represented By: Cole J Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: John R Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?