Hassan v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Petitioner: Abdirahman Hassan
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Leslie D. Tritten and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 0:2020cv02185
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Byerley on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Leslie D. Tritten, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (Byerley, David)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Leslie D. Tritten, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (Repp, Liles)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Chad Wolf, Kenneth Cuccinelli, DHS, USCIS, Leslie Tritten on 10/20/20, filed by Abdirahman Hassan. (Nestor, Bruce)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Leslie D. Tritten, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (kt)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2185 WMW/TNL. (kt)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Abdirahman Hassan. (Nestor, Bruce)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Leslie Tritten, USCIS, Chad Wolf (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8146616) filed by Abdirahman Hassan. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nestor, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Represented By: David Byerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Represented By: David Byerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Represented By: David Byerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leslie D. Tritten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Represented By: David Byerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Represented By: David Byerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdirahman Hassan
Represented By: Bruce D Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?