VanDyke v. Saul et al
Plaintiff: Rickey Paul VanDyke, II
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv02199
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Rickey Paul VanDyke, II. Andrew Saul served on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 12/15/2020 (JME).
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER REFERRING Plaintiff to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JMK)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MMP)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/21/2020. (JMK)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/21/2020. (JMK) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (MMP).
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachment: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (JGK)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Rickey Paul VanDyke, II. (JGK) Application untermed on 10/22/2020. Modified text on 10/22/2020 (MMP).
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Rickey Paul VanDyke, II. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Hildy Bowbeer per MJ Social Security List. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Modified text on 10/21/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanDyke v. Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Paul VanDyke, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?