Aldridge et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Walls, Jesus Gallego, Kevin Starin, Sheila Smith, Robert La Fraugh, Nicholas Dimas, Jason Kalp, James Matheus, Michael Martens, Dennis Woods, Kyle Owen, Bobby Cooley, Ranald Sanchez, Christian Voso, Emmanuel Vazquez, William Gack, Marlene Davis, Gregory Maschack, Joshua Bentley, Michael Homer, Jason Walker, Mark Vester, Jr., Jerrick Frazier, Keith Nitzschke, Marvin Aldridge, Adam Dale, William Kirby, Peter Barham, Robert Rutland, Trevor Eriksmoen, Timothy Magee, Daran Brown, Michael Truitt and Brandon Scroggins
Defendant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02256
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marvin Aldridge, Peter Barham, Joshua Bentley, Daran Brown, Bobby Cooley, Adam Dale, Marlene Davis, Nicholas Dimas, Trevor Eriksmoen, Jerrick Frazier, William Gack, Jesus Gallego, Michael Homer, Jason Kalp, William Kirby, Robert La Fraugh, Timothy Magee, Michael Martens, Gregory Maschack, James Matheus, Keith Nitzschke, Kyle Owen, Robert Rutland, Ranald Sanchez, Brandon Scroggins, Sheila Smith, Kevin Starin, Michael Truitt, Emmanuel Vazquez, Mark Vester, Jr, Christian Voso, Jason Walker, Darrell Walls, Dennis Woods. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-N)(Hulse, Benjamin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 Defendants' 3M Company and Aearo Technologies, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marvin Aldridge, Peter Barham, Joshua Bentley, Daran Brown, Bobby Cooley, Adam Dale, Marlene Davis, Nicholas Dimas, Trevor Eriksmoen, Jerrick Frazier, William Gack, Jesus Gallego, Michael Homer, Jason Kalp, William Kirby, Robert La Fraugh, Timothy Magee, Michael Martens, Gregory Maschack, James Matheus, Keith Nitzschke, Kyle Owen, Robert Rutland, Ranald Sanchez, Brandon Scroggins, Sheila Smith, Kevin Starin, Michael Truitt, Emmanuel Vazquez, Mark Vester, Jr, Christian Voso, Jason Walker, Darrell Walls, Dennis Woods.(Gustafson, Daniel)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, filed by Marvin Aldridge, Peter Barham, Joshua Bentley, Daran Brown, Bobby Cooley, Adam Dale, Marlene Davis, Nicholas Dimas, Trevor Eriksmoen, Jerrick Frazier, William Gack, Jesus Gallego, Michael Homer, Jason Kalp, William Kirby, Robert La Fraugh, Timothy Magee, Michael Martens, Gregory Maschack, James Matheus, Keith Nitzschke, Kyle Owen, Robert Rutland, Ranald Sanchez, Brandon Scroggins, Sheila Smith, Kevin Starin, Michael Truitt, Emmanuel Vazquez, Mark Vester, Jr, Christian Voso, Jason Walker, Darrell Walls, Dennis Woods.(Gustafson, Daniel)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marvin Aldridge, Peter Barham, Joshua Bentley, Daran Brown, Bobby Cooley, Adam Dale, Marlene Davis, Nicholas Dimas, Trevor Eriksmoen, Jerrick Frazier, William Gack, Jesus Gallego, Michael Homer, Jason Kalp, William Kirby, Robert La Fraugh, Timothy Magee, Michael Martens, Gregory Maschack, James Matheus, Keith Nitzschke, Kyle Owen, Robert Rutland, Ranald Sanchez, Brandon Scroggins, Sheila Smith, Kevin Starin, Michael Truitt, Emmanuel Vazquez, Mark Vester, Jr, Christian Voso, Jason Walker, Darrell Walls, Dennis Woods. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marvin Aldridge, Peter Barham, Joshua Bentley, Daran Brown, Bobby Cooley, Adam Dale, Marlene Davis, Nicholas Dimas, Trevor Eriksmoen, Jerrick Frazier, William Gack, Jesus Gallego, Michael Homer, Jason Kalp, William Kirby, Robert La Fraugh, Timothy Magee, Michael Martens, Gregory Maschack, James Matheus, Keith Nitzschke, Kyle Owen, Robert Rutland, Ranald Sanchez, Brandon Scroggins, Sheila Smith, Kevin Starin, Michael Truitt, Emmanuel Vazquez, Mark Vester, Jr, Christian Voso, Jason Walker, Darrell Walls, Dennis Woods. (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ashlea G. Schwarz, Richard M. Paul III as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MTP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct Assign list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-02256 JRT/KMM. (MTP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8184368) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Walls
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Gallego
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Starin
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Smith
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert La Fraugh
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dimas
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kalp
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Matheus
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martens
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Woods
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Owen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Cooley
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranald Sanchez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Voso
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Vazquez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gack
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Davis
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Maschack
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bentley
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Homer
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Walker
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vester, Jr.
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrick Frazier
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Nitzschke
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Aldridge
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Dale
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kirby
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Barham
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rutland
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Eriksmoen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Magee
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daran Brown
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Truitt
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Scroggins
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?