Taylor v. Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Tony N. Taylor
Defendant: Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02266
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Granting Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and to Strike. (Goldsmith, Neil)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General and to Strike filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC.(Goldsmith, Neil)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General and to Strike : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Goldsmith, Neil)
December 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss/General and to Strike filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Goldsmith, Neil)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/14/2020. (LLM)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 **TEXT ONLY** Notice of Cancellation of Hearing: In light of the Amended Complaint filed in this matter, the #10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General and, in the alternative, to strike : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, January 6, 2021, at 10:00 AM, before The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson is CANCELLED. (LLM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. filed by Tony N. Taylor. No summons requested. (Albanese, John)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Megan Poitevint Mitchell for Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Henry Perlowski for Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/10/2020. (NAH)
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #9 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC.(Goldsmith, Neil)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General and, in the alternative, to strike filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Goldsmith, Neil)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General and, in the alternative, to strike : Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General and, in the alternative, to strike filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Henry M. Perlowski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8202044 filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan P. Mitchell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8198457 filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, served on E. Michelle Drake (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, served on John Albanese (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, served on John Goolsby (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Goldsmith, Neil)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-2266 (PAM/DTS). (MMP)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number None (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8189126) filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to District Court, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldsmith, Neil) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony N. Taylor
Represented By: John H Goolsby
Represented By: E Michelle Drake
Represented By: John G Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Neil S Goldsmith
Represented By: Megan Poitevint Mitchell
Represented By: Henry Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?